Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0976186

EP0976186 - INSULATION STRIPPING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2000/05]INSULATION DEVICE
[2001/03]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  25.07.2003
Database last updated on 20.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip25.07.2003No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 10.09.2003  [2003/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Schleuniger Holding AG
Bierigut 9
3608 Thun / CH
[2000/05]
Inventor(s)01 / MESSER, Jürg
Reinertstrasse 53
Oberdorf SO / CH
02 / LOCHER, Beat
Bierigutstrasse 9
CH-3608 Thun / CH
03 / STREHL, Martin
Bierigutstrasse 9
CH-3608 Thun / CH
[2000/12]
Former [2000/05]01 / MESSER, Jürg
Glutz-Blotzheimstrasse 3
CH-4502 Solothurn / CH
02 / LOCHER, Beat
Bierigutstrasse 9
CH-3608 Thun / CH
03 / STREHL, Martin
Bierigutstrasse 9
CH-3608 Thun / CH
Representative(s)Rosenich, Paul
Patentbüro Paul Rosenich AG BGZ
9497 Triesenberg / LI
[N/P]
Former [2000/05]Rosenich, Paul
Patentbüro Paul Rosenich, Postfach 118
9495 Triesen / LI
Application number, filing date98909705.007.04.1998
[2000/05]
WO1998IB00505
Priority number, dateCH1997000086314.04.1997         Original published format: CH 86397
[2000/05]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9847209
Date:22.10.1998
Language:DE
[1998/42]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0976186
Date:02.02.2000
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.10.1998
[2000/05]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0976186
Date:18.09.2002
Language:DE
[2002/38]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP22.10.1998
ClassificationInternational:H02G1/12
[2000/05]
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   SE [2000/05]
TitleGerman:ABISOLIERVORRICHTUNG[2000/05]
English:INSULATION STRIPPING DEVICE[2001/03]
French:DISPOSITIF POUR DENUDER UN CABLE[2001/03]
Former [2000/05]INSULATION DEVICE
Former [2000/05]DISPOSITIF D'ISOLATION
Entry into regional phase15.11.1999National basic fee paid 
15.11.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
15.11.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure08.10.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
15.11.1999Examination requested  [2000/05]
08.01.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
06.07.2001Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination {1}
09.10.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.12.2001Fee for grant paid
21.12.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)19.06.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/37]
Request for further processing for:29.08.2001Request for further processing filed
29.08.2001Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
03.10.2001Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.05.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
02.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
02.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipSE18.12.2002
[2003/14]
Cited inInternational search[A]EP0673099  (KOMAX HOLDING AG [CH]) [A] 1,2,7 * column 2, line 25 - column 10, line 47; figures 1-14 *;
 [A]US4584912  (GUDMESTAD RAGNAR [US], et al) [A] 1,2,7,9 * column 4, line 22 - column 14, line 35; figures 1-11 *;
 [A]US5522130  (WOLLERMANN KENNETH A [US]) [A] 1,12 * column 3, line 40 - column 8, line 65; figures 1-4 *;
 [PX]WO9808283  (SCHLEUNIGER HOLDING AG [CH], et al) [PX] 1-3 * figures 1,2; claim 1 *