Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0970999

EP0970999 - ELECTRICALLY CONDUCTIVE PLASTIC MOLDED ARTICLE AND METHOD OF PRODUCTION THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  30.11.2001
Database last updated on 15.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip30.11.2001Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 16.01.2002  [2002/03]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sugimoto, Ichiro
1-1-26, Minamitsukushino Machida-shi
Tokyo 194-0002 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/02]For all designated states
Sugimoto, Ichiro
1-1-26, Minamitsukushino
Machida-shi, Tokyo 194-0002 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[2000/02]
Representative(s)Bannerman, David Gardner , et al
Withers & Rogers LLP
4 More London Riverside
London
SE1 2AU / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/02]Bannerman, David Gardner , et al
Withers & Rogers, Goldings House, 2 Hays Lane
London SE1 2HW / GB
Application number, filing date98909847.024.03.1998
[2000/02]
WO1998JP01279
Priority number, dateJP1997008728924.03.1997         Original published format: JP 8728997
JP1997014991026.05.1997         Original published format: JP 14991097
[2000/02]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9842782
Date:01.10.1998
Language:EN
[1998/39]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0970999
Date:12.01.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.10.1998
[2000/02]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP01.10.1998
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.01.2000
ClassificationInternational:C08L101/00, C08K3/00, C08K5/00
[2000/02]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/02]
TitleGerman:ELEKTRISCH LEITENDER KUNSTSTOFFFORMKÖRPER UND VERFAHREN ZU DESSEN HERSTELLUNG[2000/02]
English:ELECTRICALLY CONDUCTIVE PLASTIC MOLDED ARTICLE AND METHOD OF PRODUCTION THEREOF[2000/02]
French:ARTICLES MOULES DE PLASTIQUE ELECTROCONDUCTEUR ET LEUR PROCEDE DE FABRICATION[2000/02]
Entry into regional phase05.10.1999Translation filed 
08.10.1999National basic fee paid 
08.10.1999Search fee paid 
08.10.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
08.10.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure22.10.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP
08.10.1999Examination requested  [2000/02]
26.11.2001Application withdrawn by applicant  [2002/03]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
07.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[PX]EP0786496  (SUGIMOTO ICHIRO [JP]) [PX] 1-3 * claims 1-3,6,8,10,12,17 *;
 [X]ZA9206598  ;
 [X]GB1520844  (REID B C) [X] 1 * example - * * page 1, line 90 - page 2, line 48 *;
 [X]JPH03757  ;
 [A]EP0716804  (SUGIMOTO ICHIRO [JP]) [A] 1 * claim 1 *;
 [A]JPH07118499  ;
 [A]JPS6142556  ;
 [A]JPH10231384
 [X]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1993, no. 39, Database accession no. 1993-311994, XP002126347 & ZA9206598 A 19930630 (CSIR) [X] 1 * abstract *
 [X]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1991, no. 07, Database accession no. 1991-048160, XP002126348 & JPH03757 A 19910107 (SUMITOMO BAKELITE CO) [X] 1 * abstract *
 [A]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1995, no. 27, Database accession no. 1995-204015, XP002126349 & JPH07118499 A 19950509 (SUMITOMO BAKELITE CO LTD) [A] 1 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19860711), vol. 010, no. 199, Database accession no. (C - 359), & JP61042556 A 19860301 (SUMITOMO BAKELITE CO LTD) [A] 1 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19981231), vol. 1998, no. 14, & JP10231384 A 19980902 (YOKOHAMA RUBBER CO LTD:THE) [A] 1 * abstract *
International search[A]JPH08231790  (MITSUBISHI CHEM CORP);
 [A]JPH0920859  (SUMITOMO BAKELITE CO);
 [X]JPS62285931  (ASAHI CHEMICAL IND)