Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0972833

EP0972833 - PROBES FOR THE DIAGNOSIS OF INFECTIONS CAUSED BY KLEBSIELLA PNEUMONIAE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2000/03]PROBES FOR THE DIAGNOSIS OF INFECTIONS CAUSED BY $i(KLEBSIELLA PNEUMONIAE)
[2000/30]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.12.2004
Database last updated on 15.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip03.12.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 19.01.2005  [2005/03]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
FUSO PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD.
7-10, Doshomachi 1-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi
Osaka 541-0045 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/03]For all designated states
FUSO PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD.
7-10, Doshomachi 1-chome, Chuo-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-0045 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / UEYAMA, Hiroshi
9-1412, Morinomiya 2-chome Joto-ku Osaka-shi
Osaka 536-0025 / JP
02 / ABE, Kanako
30-39, Murano-Honmachi Hirataka-shi
Osaka 573-0016 / JP
03 / KESHI, Hiroyuki
2-25, Tonotsuji 1-chome Sumiyoshi-ku Osaka-shi
Osaka 558-0042 / JP
04 / MATSUHISA, Akio
7-506, Morinomiya 2-chome Joto-ku Osaka-shi
Osaka 536-0025 / JP
[2000/34]
Former [2000/03]01 / UEYAMA, Hiroshi
9-1412, Morinomiya 2-chome Joto-ku Osaka-shi
Osaka 536-0025 / JP
02 / ABE, Kanako
Iwashimizu View Heights C-712 8, Yawata Kitaura
Yawata-shi Kyoto 614-8014 / JP
03 / KESHI, Hiroyuki
2-25, Tonotsuji 1-chome Sumiyoshi-ku Osaka-shi
Osaka 558-0042 / JP
04 / MATSUHISA, Akio
7-506, Morinomiya 2-chome Joto-ku Osaka-shi
Osaka 536-0025 / JP
Representative(s)Webber, Philip Michael , et al
Dehns
St Bride's House
10 Salisbury Square
London
EC4Y 8JD / GB
[N/P]
Former [2002/47]Webber, Philip Michael , et al
Frank B. Dehn & Co., 179 Queen Victoria Street
London EC4V 4EL / GB
Former [2000/03]Towler, Philip Dean , et al
Frank B. Dehn & Co., European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street
London EC4V 4EL / GB
Application number, filing date98909854.623.03.1998
[2000/03]
WO1998JP01286
Priority number, dateJP1997007108225.03.1997         Original published format: JP 7108297
[2000/03]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9842843
Date:01.10.1998
Language:EN
[1998/39]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0972833
Date:19.01.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.10.1998
[2000/03]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0972833
Date:28.01.2004
Language:EN
[2004/05]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP01.10.1998
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.08.2002
ClassificationInternational:C12N15/31, C12Q1/68, C07K14/315
[2002/41]
Former International [2000/03]C12N15/31, C12Q1/68
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [2000/03]
TitleGerman:SONDEN ZUM NACHWEIS VON INFEKTION DURCH KLEBSIELLA PNEUMONIAE[2000/03]
English:PROBES FOR THE DIAGNOSIS OF INFECTIONS CAUSED BY KLEBSIELLA PNEUMONIAE[2000/30]
French:SONDES POUR LE DIAGNOSTIC D'INFECTIONS DUES AU KLEBSIELLA PNEUMONIAE[2000/30]
Former [2000/03]PROBES FOR THE DIAGNOSIS OF INFECTIONS CAUSED BY $i(KLEBSIELLA PNEUMONIAE)
Former [2000/03]SONDES POUR LE DIAGNOSTIC D'INFECTIONS DUES AU $i(KLEBSIELLA PNEUMONIAE)
Entry into regional phase21.10.1999Translation filed 
21.10.1999National basic fee paid 
21.10.1999Search fee paid 
21.10.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
21.10.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure04.09.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP
21.10.1999Examination requested  [2000/03]
24.04.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01)
03.06.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.07.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.11.2003Fee for grant paid
13.11.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)29.10.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2005/03]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
26.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
26.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
28.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0652291  (FUSO PHARMACEUTICAL IND [JP], et al) [A] 1 * the whole document *
International search[A]  - NIJKAMP H J, "BACTERIOCINOGENIC PLASMID C1LDF13 COMPLETE NUCLEOTIDE SEQUENCE", MPSRCH GENBANK, (19000101), Database accession no. X04466, XP002914698