Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0975382

EP0975382 - INHALATION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  05.09.2003
Database last updated on 15.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip05.09.2003Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 22.10.2003  [2003/43]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
AstraZeneca AB
151 85 Södertälje / SE
[2000/19]
Former [2000/05]For all designated states
Astra Aktiebolag
151 85 Södertälje / SE
Inventor(s)01 / DAGSLAND, Allan
Musseronvägen 13
S-374 40 Karlshamn / SE
02 / MALMQVIST-GRANLUND, Karin
Floravägen 9
S-244 41 Kävlinge / SE
03 / VIRTANEN, Risto
Torenvägen 10 C
FIN-01900 Nurmijärvi / FI
[2000/05]
Application number, filing date98909949.413.03.1998
[2000/05]
WO1998SE00460
Priority number, dateSE1997000094014.03.1997         Original published format: SE 9700940
[2000/05]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9841259
Date:24.09.1998
Language:EN
[1998/38]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0975382
Date:02.02.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.09.1998
[2000/05]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP24.09.1998
ClassificationInternational:A61M15/00
[2000/05]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/05]
Extension statesLT14.10.1999
LV14.10.1999
MK14.10.1999
RO14.10.1999
SI14.10.1999
TitleGerman:INHALATIONSGERÄT[2000/05]
English:INHALATION DEVICE[2000/05]
French:INHALATEUR[2000/05]
Entry into regional phase14.10.1999National basic fee paid 
14.10.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
14.10.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure07.10.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
14.10.1999Examination requested  [2000/05]
05.12.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.04.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2003/43]
20.05.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2003/43]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
02.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
02.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
31.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
Cited inInternational search[X]WO9414492  (SCHERING CORP [US], et al) [X] 1-4,12,14-17,21,22,29-31 * the whole document *;
 [X]WO9700703  (ASTA MEDICA AG [DE]) [X] 1-4,16,21,22,30,31 * abstract * * page 54, line 3 - page 57, line 4; figures 15,16 *;
 [A]WO9204928  (PHARBITA BV [NL], et al) [A] 1,3,30,31 * abstract *