Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1012793

EP1012793 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR LOCATING INDIVIDUALS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2000/26]SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR LOCATING INDIVIDUALS AND EQUIPMENT, AIRLINE RESERVATION SYSTEM, COMMUNICATION SYSTEM
[2002/36]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  20.02.2004
Database last updated on 12.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip07.03.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 09.04.2008  [2008/15]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Micron Technology, Inc.
8000 South Federal Way
Boise, ID 83706-9632 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/26]For all designated states
MICRON TECHNOLOGY, INC.
8000 South Federal Way
Boise, ID 83706-9632 / US
Inventor(s)01 / TUTTLE, John, R.
5514 West Lake River Lane
Boise, ID 83703 / US
[2000/26]
Representative(s)Carpenter, David , et al
Marks & Clerk LLP Alpha Tower Suffolk Street Queensway Birmingham
B1 1TT / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/26]Carpenter, David , et al
MARKS & CLERK, Alpha Tower, Suffolk Street Queensway
Birmingham B1 1TT / GB
Application number, filing date98909995.710.02.1998
[2000/26]
WO1998US02559
Priority number, dateUS1997080767827.02.1997         Original published format: US 807678
[2000/26]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9838600
Date:03.09.1998
Language:EN
[1998/35]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1012793
Date:28.06.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.09.1998
[2000/26]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1012793
Date:16.04.2003
Language:EN
[2003/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP03.09.1998
ClassificationInternational:G07C9/00, G08B3/10
[2000/26]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/26]
TitleGerman:SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR ORTUNG VON PERSONEN[2002/36]
English:SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR LOCATING INDIVIDUALS[2002/36]
French:DISPOSITIF ET PROCEDE PERMETTANT DE LOCALISER DES PERSONNES[2002/36]
Former [2000/26]SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR ORTUNG VON PERSONEN UND GEGENSTÄNDEN, FLUGTICKET-RESERVIERUNGS- SOWIE KOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM
Former [2000/26]SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR LOCATING INDIVIDUALS AND EQUIPMENT, AIRLINE RESERVATION SYSTEM, COMMUNICATION SYSTEM
Former [2000/26]DISPOSITIF ET PROCEDE PERMETTANT DE LOCALISER DES PERSONNES ET DE L'EQUIPEMENT, SYSTEME DE RESERVATION POUR ENTREPRISE DE TRANSPORT AERIEN, SYSTEME DE COMMUNICATION
Entry into regional phase24.08.1999National basic fee paid 
24.08.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
24.08.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure22.09.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
24.08.1999Examination requested  [2000/26]
23.08.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
15.02.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.04.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
04.07.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.08.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.11.2002Fee for grant paid
29.11.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)19.01.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/15]
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.02.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
15.02.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
13.02.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
12.02.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT16.04.2003
BE16.04.2003
CH16.04.2003
FI16.04.2003
IT16.04.2003
LI16.04.2003
NL16.04.2003
DK16.07.2003
GR16.07.2003
PT16.07.2003
SE16.07.2003
ES30.10.2003
[2008/15]
Former [2004/28]AT16.04.2003
BE16.04.2003
CH16.04.2003
FI16.04.2003
LI16.04.2003
NL16.04.2003
DK16.07.2003
GR16.07.2003
PT16.07.2003
SE16.07.2003
ES30.10.2003
Former [2004/23]AT16.04.2003
CH16.04.2003
FI16.04.2003
LI16.04.2003
NL16.04.2003
DK16.07.2003
GR16.07.2003
PT16.07.2003
SE16.07.2003
ES30.10.2003
Former [2004/05]AT16.04.2003
CH16.04.2003
FI16.04.2003
LI16.04.2003
NL16.04.2003
GR16.07.2003
PT16.07.2003
SE16.07.2003
ES30.10.2003
Former [2004/04]AT16.04.2003
CH16.04.2003
LI16.04.2003
NL16.04.2003
GR16.07.2003
PT16.07.2003
SE16.07.2003
ES30.10.2003
Former [2004/03]AT16.04.2003
CH16.04.2003
LI16.04.2003
NL16.04.2003
GR16.07.2003
PT16.07.2003
SE16.07.2003
Former [2004/02]CH16.04.2003
LI16.04.2003
NL16.04.2003
GR16.07.2003
PT16.07.2003
SE16.07.2003
Former [2004/01]CH16.04.2003
LI16.04.2003
NL16.04.2003
PT16.07.2003
SE16.07.2003
Former [2003/41]SE16.07.2003
Cited inInternational search[XY]FR2673743  (RAGAGNIN MORENO) [X] 1-11 * page 4, line 6 - page 7, line 27; figures 1-4 * [Y] 12-25;
 [Y]WO9302433  (ANAGNOSTOPOULOS A PANAGIOTIS [GR]) [Y] 12-25 * page 12, line 1 - page 19, line 25; figures 1-9 *;
 [X]WO9501617  (EXECUTONE INF SYS INC [US]) [X] 1-11 * page 5, line 4 - page 8, line 18; figures 1,2 *