Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0969988

EP0969988 - DRIVER INTERFACE SYSTEM FOR VEHICLE CONTROL PARAMETERS AND EASY TO UTILIZE SWITCHES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  09.02.2001
Database last updated on 15.07.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip09.02.2001Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 28.03.2001 [2001/13]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Lear Automotive Dearborn, Inc.
5200 Auto Club Drive
Dearborn, Michigan 48126 / US
[2000/02]
Inventor(s)01 / MILLER, Robin, Mihekun
108 Burbank Road
Ellington, CT 06029 / US
02 / HARTMAN, Hollister
45171 Emery Drive
Northville, MI 48167 / US
[2000/02]
Representative(s)Archer, Philip Bruce , et al
Urquhart-Dykes & Lord European Patent Attorneys New Priestgate House 57 Priestgate
Peterborough, Cambridgeshire PE1 1JX / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/02]Archer, Philip Bruce , et al
Urquhart-Dykes & Lord European Patent Attorneys New Priestgate House 57 Priestgate
Peterborough Cambridgeshire PE1 1JX / GB
Application number, filing date98910104.326.02.1998
[2000/02]
WO1998US03906
Priority number, dateUS1997082372525.03.1997         Original published format: US 823725
[2000/02]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO9842539
Date:01.10.1998
Language:EN
[1998/39]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0969988
Date:12.01.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.10.1998
[2000/02]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP23.12.1998
ClassificationInternational:B60R16/00
[2000/02]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   GB,   IT [2000/02]
TitleGerman:BENUTZERSCHNITTSTELLENSYSTEM FÜR FAHRZEUGSTEUERPARAMETER UND LEICHT VERWENDBARE SCHALTERANORDNUNGEN[2000/02]
English:DRIVER INTERFACE SYSTEM FOR VEHICLE CONTROL PARAMETERS AND EASY TO UTILIZE SWITCHES[2000/02]
French:SYSTEME D'INTERFACE POUR CONDUCTEUR DE REGLAGE DES PARAMETRES DE COMMANDE DE VEHICULE ET COMMUTATEURS FACILES A UTILISER[2000/02]
Entry into regional phase15.09.1999National basic fee paid 
15.09.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
15.09.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.10.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
15.09.1999Examination requested  [2000/02]
29.01.2001Application withdrawn by applicant  [2001/13]
Fees paidRenewal fee
03.02.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[XY]DE29604717U  (MOELLER JENS ULRICH [DE]) [X] 1-3,7 * page 1, line 12 - page 2, line 4 * * page 3, line 26 - line 29; figure - * [Y] 4-6,8,9;
 [Y]DE4130993  (ADAM OPEL AG) [Y] 4,8 * column 2, line 46 - line 55 * * column 3, line 12 - line 33; figure - *;
 [X]DE19539847  (DAIMLER BENZ AG [DE]) [X] 10,11 * column 1, line 40 - line 47; figure - *;
 [Y]US5539429  (YANO HARUTO [JP], et al) [Y] 5,9 * abstract *;
 [Y]DE4238301  (LEGUIN GUDRUN SYBILLE [DE]) [Y] 6 * column 2, line 48 - line 68; figure - *;
 [A]US5525977  (SUMAN MICHAEL J [US]) [A] 1 * abstract *;
 [A]DE4437024  (SCHNEIDER JOERG [DE], et al) [A] 4,8 * abstract *;
 [X]JPS608118  ;
 [X]DE4132499  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 12,14 * column 4, line 64 - column 5, line 6 * * column 6, line 17 - line 25; figures 2,3 *;
 [E]US5760554  (BUSTAMANTE JAMES M [US]) [E] 12,14 * column 3, line 18 - line 56; figure 3 *;
 [X]US4809177  (WINDLE W ERIC [US], et al) [X] 12 * column 4, line 61 - column 5, line 10 * * column 14, line 31 - line 46 * * column 28, line 51 - column 29, line 18 *;
 [X]FR2570037  (RENAULT [FR]) [X] 12 * page 4, line 31 - page 5, line 6; figure 5 *;
 [X]FR2696384  (FAURE BERTRAND AUTOMOBILE [FR]) [X] 17 * page 2, line 31 - page 3, line 4 * * page 3, line 19 - page 4, line 6 * * page 6, line 23 - line 27 * * page 7, line 18 - line 28 * * page 9, line 1 - line 25; figure - *;
 [X]EP0505336  (CODRINO GIUSEPPE [IT]) [X] 17 * column 3, line 3 - line 11 * * column 4, line 33 - line 35; figure 1 *
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19850525), vol. 009, no. 121, Database accession no. (M - 382), & JP60008118 A 19850117 (SUMITOMO DENKI KOGYO KK) [X] 12,13 * abstract *