Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1014945

EP1014945 - CATIONIC LIPID COMPOSITIONS TARGETING ANGIOGENIC ENDOTHELIAL CELLS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  28.03.2008
Database last updated on 20.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip15.08.2008Change - representativepublished on 17.09.2008  [2008/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
The Regents of the University of California
1111 Franklin Street, 12th Floor
Oakland, CA 94607 / US
[N/P]
Former [2007/21]For all designated states
The Regents of the University of California
1111 Franklin Street, 12th Floor
Oakland, CA 94607-5200 / US
Former [2000/27]For all designated states
The Regents of the University of California
12th Floor, 1111 Franklin Street
Oakland, CA 94607-5200 / US
Inventor(s)01 / MCDONALD, Donald, M.
67 Parker Avenue
San Francisco, CA 94118 / US
02 / MCLEAN, John
782 Lakeshore Drive
Redwood City, CA 94065 / US
03 / THURSTON, O., Gavin
1839 10th Avenue
San Francisco, CA 94122 / US
04 / BALUK, Peter
1271 9th Avenue
San Francisco, CA 94122 / US
[2000/27]
Representative(s)Dey, Michael , et al
Weickmann & Weickmann
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Richard-Strauss-Strasse 80
81679 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/38]Dey, Michael , et al
Weickmann & Weickmann Patentanwälte Postfach 86 08 20
81635 München / DE
Former [2007/24]Dey, Michael , et al
Weickmann & Weickmann Postfach 860 820
81635 München / DE
Former [2000/27]Huber, Bernhard, Dipl.-Chem. , et al
Patentanwälte H. Weickmann, Dr. K. Fincke F.A. Weickmann, B. Huber Dr. H. Liska, Dr. J. Prechtel, Dr. B. Böhm Postfach 86 08 20
81635 München / DE
Application number, filing date98910354.412.03.1998
[2000/27]
WO1998US04891
Priority number, dateUS1997082033712.03.1997         Original published format: US 820337
[2000/27]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9840052
Date:17.09.1998
Language:EN
[1998/37]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1014945
Date:05.07.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.09.1998
[2000/27]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1014945
Date:23.05.2007
Language:EN
[2007/21]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US17.09.1998
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.08.2002
ClassificationInternational:A61K9/127
[2000/27]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/27]
Extension statesLV10.09.1999
RO10.09.1999
SI10.09.1999
TitleGerman:KATIONISCHE LIPIDZUSAMMENSTELLUNG ZUR MARKIERUNG VON ANGIOGENISCHEN ENDOTHELZELLEN[2000/27]
English:CATIONIC LIPID COMPOSITIONS TARGETING ANGIOGENIC ENDOTHELIAL CELLS[2000/27]
French:COMPOSITIONS LIPIDIQUES CATIONIQUES CIBLANT LES CELLULES ENDOTHELIALES ANGIOGENIQUES[2000/27]
Entry into regional phase10.09.1999National basic fee paid 
10.09.1999Search fee paid 
10.09.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
10.09.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure04.09.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
10.09.1999Examination requested  [2000/27]
16.01.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.05.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.08.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.11.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.01.2005Date of oral proceedings
21.02.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
21.02.2005Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
07.03.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.09.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.01.2007Fee for grant paid
09.01.2007Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP07000360.3  / EP1767192
Opposition(s)26.02.2008No opposition filed within time limit [2008/18]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.02.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
21.02.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
22.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
24.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
22.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
22.03.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
29.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 09
28.03.2007Renewal fee patent year 10
Lapses during opposition  TooltipDK23.05.2007
FI23.05.2007
SE23.08.2007
GR24.08.2007
PT23.10.2007
[2008/21]
Former [2008/15]DK23.05.2007
FI23.05.2007
SE23.08.2007
PT23.10.2007
Documents cited:Search[X]WO9318751  (UNIV GEORGETOWN [US]) [X] 1,8 * claims 1,3 *;
 [X]WO9529242  (CHILDRENS MEDICAL CENTER [US]) [X] 1,3,5,8,9 * page 69 - page 71; example 3 *;
 [PX]EP0819758  (MIXSON ARCHIBALD JAMES [US]) [PX] 1,3,5,8,9 * page 16, line 30 - page 17, line 36 *;
 [X]  - CAMPBELL ROBERT B ET AL, "Cationic liposome mediated drug delivery.", BIOPHYSICAL JOURNAL, 41st Annual Meeting of the Biophysical Society;New Orleans, Louisiana, USA; March 2-6, 1997, (1997), vol. 72, no. 2 PART 2, ISSN 0006-3495, page A303, XP008006482 [X] 1,8 * the whole document *
 [PX]  - MCLEAN J W ET AL, "ORGAN-SPECIFIC ENDOTHELIAL CELL UPTAKE OF CATIONIC LIPOSOME-DNA COMPLEXES IN MICE", AMERICAN JOURNAL OF PHYSIOLOGY, AMERICAN PHYSIOLOGICAL SOCIETY, BETHESDA, MD, US, (199707), vol. 1, PART 2, no. 273, ISSN 0002-9513, pages H387 - H404, XP008006414 [PX] 1-9 * the whole document *
International search[Y]US5264618  (FELGNER PHILIP L [US], et al);
 [Y]WO9324640  (UNIV CALIFORNIA [US], et al);
 [Y]US5202352  (OKADA HIROAKI [US], et al);
 [Y]US5192744  (BOUCK NOEL P [US], et al);
 [Y]  - MORISHITA K, JOHNSON D E, WILLIAMS L T, "A NOVEL PROMOTER FOR VASCULAR ENDOTHELIAL GROWTH FACTOR RECEPTOR (FLT-1) THAT CONFERS ENDOTHELIAL-SPECIFIC GENE EXPRESSION", Journal of Biological Chemistry, American Society for Biochemistry and Molecular Biology, US, US, (19951117), vol. 270, no. 46, doi:10.1074/jbc.270.46.27948, ISSN 0021-9258, pages 27948 - 27953, XP002912596

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.270.46.27948