Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0973637

EP0973637 - METHOD OF WORKING PAPERBOARD BLANKS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  17.02.2006
Database last updated on 18.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip17.02.2006Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 05.04.2006  [2006/14]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
United Container Machinery
5200 Glen Arm Road
Glen Arm, MD 21057 / US
[2000/04]
Inventor(s)01 / RUTHENBERG, Meyer, L.
10730 Hewitt Farms Road
Owings Mills, MD 21117 / US
02 / LARKIN, Barry, E.
2403 Hartfell Road
Timonium, MD 21093 / US
[2000/04]
Representative(s)Johnstone, Douglas Ian , et al
Baron Warren Redfern
1000 Great West Road
Brentford TW8 9DW / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/04]Johnstone, Douglas Ian , et al
Baron & Warren, 18 South End
Kensington, London W8 5BU / GB
Application number, filing date98910403.913.03.1998
[2000/04]
WO1998US05038
Priority number, dateUS1997084010611.04.1997         Original published format: US 840106
[2000/04]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9846420
Date:22.10.1998
Language:EN
[1998/42]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0973637
Date:26.01.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.10.1998
[2000/04]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US22.10.1998
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.07.2005
ClassificationInternational:B31B1/25, B31F1/10
[2005/36]
Former International [2000/04]B31B1/25
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IE,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [2000/04]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR BEARBEITUNG VON KARTONZUSCHNITTEN[2000/04]
English:METHOD OF WORKING PAPERBOARD BLANKS[2000/04]
French:PROCEDE DE TRAVAIL DE DECOUPES EN CARTON[2000/04]
Entry into regional phase24.09.1999National basic fee paid 
24.09.1999Search fee paid 
24.09.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
24.09.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure15.10.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
24.09.1999Examination requested  [2000/04]
01.10.2005Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2006/14]
07.11.2005Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2006/14]
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
30.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
25.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
24.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
22.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.200508   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]US3717074  (RASMUSSEN W) [A] 1,8,11 * column 2, line 35 - column 3, line 47; figures 1,4 *;
 [A]US3087392  (WARD JR HENRY D, et al) [A] 1,8,11 * column 2, line 16 - column 4, line 59; figures 1,17 *;
 [A]US4684360  (TOKUNO MASATERU [JP], et al) [A] 1,8,11 * abstract *
International search[Y]US5373721  (WELSH ROBERT E [US], et al);
 [A]US2760263  (NELSON GEERTSEN);
 [A]US3257882  (LULIE ALBERT L, et al);
 [A]US3456565  (FLAUM MITCHEL, et al);
 [A]US3882765  (TOKUNO MASATERU);
 [A]US1196912  (WECK ELMER E [US]);
 [A]US4006656  (SHINOMIYA TSUTOMU);
 [A]US4010677  (HIRAKAWA TADASHI, et al);
 [A]US4026176  (WEISKOPF GUNTHER);
 [A]US4033217  (FLAUM STEPHEN S, et al);
 [A]US4122791  (BROWN OMAR L);
 [A]US4132157  (SHINOMIYA TSUTOMU);
 [A]US4137829  (SARKA ALBERT J);
 [A]US4224847  (TOKUNO MASATERU);
 [A]US4237791  (JACKSON KEITH L [US], et al);
 [A]US4261239  (TOBOSHI KATSUMASA, et al);
 [A]US4269097  (LINN S STEPHEN);
 [A]US4348464  (KHOURY NICK S);
 [A]US4516454  (MOSBURGER HANS [DE]);
 [A]US4627214  (ANDERSON LELAND J [US], et al);
 [A]US4684360  (TOKUNO MASATERU [JP], et al)