Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0969921

EP0969921 - TOWER PACKING SUPPORT PLATE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  03.10.2003
Database last updated on 17.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip03.10.2003Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 19.11.2003  [2003/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NORTON CHEMICAL PROCESS PRODUCTS CORPORATION
3855 Fishcreek Road Stow
Ohio 44224 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/02]For all designated states
NORTON CHEMICAL PROCESS PRODUCTS CORPORATION
3855 Fishcreek Road
Stow, Ohio 44224 / US
Inventor(s)01 / DOLAN, Michael, J.
6729 Old Royalton Road
Brecksville, OH 44141 / US
[2000/02]
Representative(s)Richebourg, Michel François
Cabinet Michel Richebourg
"Le Clos du Golf"
69, rue Saint-Simon
42000 Saint Etienne / FR
[N/P]
Former [2000/02]Richebourg, Michel François
Cabinet Michel Richebourg, "Le Clos du Golf", 69, rue Saint-Simon
42000 Saint Etienne / FR
Application number, filing date98910412.016.03.1998
[2000/02]
WO1998US05062
Priority number, dateUS1997082162820.03.1997         Original published format: US 821628
[2000/02]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9841321
Date:24.09.1998
Language:EN
[1998/38]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0969921
Date:12.01.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.09.1998
[2000/02]
Search report(s)International search reportEP24.09.1998
ClassificationInternational:B01J19/30, B01J19/32
[2000/02]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2000/02]
TitleGerman:TRAGPLATTE FÜR KOLONNENPACKUNG[2000/02]
English:TOWER PACKING SUPPORT PLATE[2000/02]
French:PLAQUE DE SUPPORT POUR TOURS A EMBALLER[2000/02]
Entry into regional phase20.10.1999National basic fee paid 
20.10.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
20.10.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure15.09.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
20.10.1999Examination requested  [2000/02]
02.07.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
17.09.2003Application withdrawn by applicant  [2003/47]
Fees paidRenewal fee
06.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
02.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
22.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
31.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
Cited inInternational search[Y]DE8712438U  (ENVICON LUFT- UND WASSERTECHNIK GMBH & CO KG) [Y] 1 * page 5, paragraph L - page 6, paragraph 1 * * figure - *;
 [Y]US5000883  (LEVA MAX [US]) [Y] 1 * column W *;
 [A]GB2046623  (NORTON CO) [A] * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0257152  (NORTON CO [US]) [A] * abstract * * column 7, line 22 - line 26 * * figure 13 *;
 [A]US3070360  (RAFFERTY MARTIN A, et al) [A] * column 3, line 15 - line 37 * * figure 2 *