Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0972330

EP0972330 - FLYWHEEL POWER SUPPLY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  12.09.2003
Database last updated on 18.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip07.03.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 09.04.2008  [2008/15]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Satcon Technology Corporation
161 First Street
Cambridge, MA 02142-1221 / US
[2000/03]
Inventor(s)01 / HOCKNEY, Richard, L.
907 Summer Street
Lynnfield, MA 01940 / US
02 / NICHOLS, Stephen, B.
P.O. Box 12
Charlestown, MA 02129 / US
03 / LANSBERRY, Geoffrey, B.
305 Cardinal Medieros 1
Cambridge, MA 02141 / US
04 / NIMBLETT, Francis, E.
4 Oakhurst Road
Beverly, MA 01915 / US
05 / BUSHKO, Dariusz, A.
4 Lamplighter Lane
Hopkinton, MA 10748 / US
06 / RAO, Gita, P.
83 Lexington Street
Belmont, MA 02178 / US
07 / SERDAR, Luka
15 Turning Mill Road
Lexington, MA 02173 / US
08 / AMARAL, Michael, E.
Apartment 5 943 Washington Street
Norwood, MA 02062 / US
09 / STANTON, William, E.
189 Bishops Forest Drive
Waltham, MA 02154 / US
10 / O'ROURKE, James
480 Washington Street
Woburn, MA 01801 / US
[2000/03]
Representative(s)Prüfer, Lutz H. , et al
PRÜFER & PARTNER GbR
Patentanwälte
Harthauser Strasse 25d
81545 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/03]Prüfer, Lutz H., Dipl.-Phys. , et al
PRÜFER & PARTNER, Patentanwälte, Harthauser Strasse 25d
81545 München / DE
Application number, filing date98910472.413.03.1998
[2000/03]
WO1998US05278
Priority number, dateUS1997082486226.03.1997         Original published format: US 824862
[2000/03]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9843341
Date:01.10.1998
Language:EN
[1998/39]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0972330
Date:19.01.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.10.1998
[2000/03]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0972330
Date:06.11.2002
Language:EN
[2002/45]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US01.10.1998
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.02.2000
ClassificationInternational:H02K7/02, H02K7/08, H02K7/09
[2000/03]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/03]
TitleGerman:SCHWUNGRADBETRIEBENE STROMVERSORGUNGSEINHEIT[2000/03]
English:FLYWHEEL POWER SUPPLY[2000/03]
French:ALIMENTATION DE VOLANT MAGNETIQUE[2000/03]
Entry into regional phase21.09.1999National basic fee paid 
21.09.1999Search fee paid 
21.09.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
21.09.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure23.09.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
21.09.1999Examination requested  [2000/03]
21.09.1999Request for accelerated examination filed
07.07.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
07.07.2000Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes
05.01.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
31.01.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
09.05.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.05.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
30.07.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.05.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
06.09.2002Fee for grant paid
06.09.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
16.09.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
Opposition(s)07.08.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/44]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
29.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
22.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT06.11.2002
FI06.11.2002
GR06.11.2002
IT06.11.2002
NL06.11.2002
DK06.02.2003
PT06.02.2003
SE06.02.2003
MC31.03.2003
ES29.05.2003
[2008/15]
Former [2007/17]AT06.11.2002
FI06.11.2002
GR06.11.2002
NL06.11.2002
DK06.02.2003
PT06.02.2003
SE06.02.2003
MC31.03.2003
ES29.05.2003
Former [2005/02]AT06.11.2002
FI06.11.2002
GR06.11.2002
NL06.11.2002
PT06.02.2003
SE06.02.2003
MC31.03.2003
ES29.05.2003
Former [2004/04]AT06.11.2002
FI06.11.2002
GR06.11.2002
NL06.11.2002
PT06.02.2003
SE06.02.2003
ES29.05.2003
Former [2003/43]AT06.11.2002
FI06.11.2002
GR06.11.2002
NL06.11.2002
PT06.02.2003
SE06.02.2003
Former [2003/37]AT06.11.2002
GR06.11.2002
NL06.11.2002
PT06.02.2003
SE06.02.2003
Former [2003/31]GR06.11.2002
NL06.11.2002
PT06.02.2003
SE06.02.2003
Former [2003/30]NL06.11.2002
PT06.02.2003
SE06.02.2003
Former [2003/29]PT06.02.2003
SE06.02.2003
Former [2003/19]SE06.02.2003
Documents cited:Search[X]US5614777  (BITTERLY JACK G [US], et al) [X] 1,21 * column A * * column 3, line 39 - column 5, line 7 * * column 6, line 19 - column 7, line 43; figures 2,3 *
International search[X]US5559381  (ROSEN HAROLD A [US], et al);
 [X]US3955858  (POUBEAU PIERRE);
 [X]US4211452  (POUBEAU PIERRE [FR]);
 [A]US3874778  (KATO SHIGEO, et al);
 [A]US4541772  (BECKER WILLI [DE]);
 [A]US5708312  (ROSEN HAROLD A [US], et al);
 [A]US5628232  (ROSEN HAROLD A [US], et al)