blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0970380 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0970380



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 84
21.07.2004 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
07.08.2003 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
10.05.2003 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
10.05.2003 Translation of the claims Search / examination 2
10.05.2003 Translation of the claims Search / examination 2
26.03.2003 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
26.03.2003 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
26.03.2003 Text intended for grant Search / examination 8
26.10.2001 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
02.10.2001 Annexes filed during the procedure of transfer of rights Search / examination 14
02.10.2001 Request for transfer of rights Search / examination 1
24.11.2000 Request concerning the applicant/representative Search / examination 1
16.11.2000 Request concerning the applicant/representative Search / examination 1
25.09.2000 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
08.09.2000 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
01.12.1999 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
09.11.1999 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
09.11.1999 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
14.10.1999 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
21.01.1999 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
02.11.1998 Priority document Search / examination 14
24.09.1998 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 6
24.09.1998 International publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 10