blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP0970380
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP0970380Global Dossier 17.09.2003B1
EP0970380 12.01.2000A1
Priority number Date
AT18097 26.03.1997
AT9800077 24.03.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2285531 15.06.2004C
CA2285531 01.10.1998A1
Priority number Date
AT18097 26.03.1997
AT9800077 24.03.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE59809649D 23.10.2003D1
Priority number Date
AT18097 26.03.1997
AT9800077 24.03.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
PL185317B 30.04.2003B1
PL337206 14.08.2000A1
Priority number Date
AT18097 26.03.1997
AT9800077 24.03.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US6400135 04.06.2002B1
Priority number Date
AT18097 26.03.1997
AT9800077 24.03.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO9843097Global Dossier 01.10.1998A1
Priority number Date
AT18097 26.03.1997
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
AT1979U 25.02.1998U1
Priority number Date
AT18097 26.03.1997