Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0970380

EP0970380 - MOUNTING FOR A WHEEL-SPEED SENSOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  23.07.2004
Database last updated on 18.11.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip18.02.2005Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): BE
published on 06.04.2005  [2005/14]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Steyr-Daimler-Puch Spezialfahrzeug AG & Co. KG
2 Haidequerstrasse 3
1111 Wien / AT
[2001/50]
Former [2000/02]For all designated states
STEYR-DAIMLER-PUCH AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Franz-Josefs-Kai 51
1010 Wien / AT
Inventor(s)01 / SKOFF, Gerhard
Feldkellergasse 41
A-1130 Wien / AT
02 / STRASSER, Alfred
Gregorygasse 47/16/1
A-1230 Wien / AT
[2000/02]
Representative(s)Rippel, Andreas
Patentanwalt Dipl.-Ing. Rippel
Kommandit-Partnerschaft
Maxingstrasse 34
1130 Wien / AT
[N/P]
Former [2000/45]Rippel, Andreas, Dipl.-Ing.
Patentanwalt Dipl.-Ing. Rippel Kommandit-Partnerschaft Maxingstrasse 34
1130 Wien / AT
Former [2000/02]Kovac, Werner , et al
c/o Steyr-Daimler-Puch AG Patent- und Lizenzwesen Franz-Josefs-Kai 51
1010 Wien / AT
Application number, filing date98910517.624.03.1998
[2000/02]
WO1998AT00077
Priority number, dateAT1997000018026.03.1997         Original published format: AT 18097
[2000/02]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9843097
Date:01.10.1998
Language:DE
[1998/39]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0970380
Date:12.01.2000
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.10.1998
[2000/02]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0970380
Date:17.09.2003
Language:DE
[2003/38]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP01.10.1998
ClassificationInternational:G01P3/44, G01P1/02, B60T8/00
[2000/02]
Designated contracting statesBE,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL [2000/02]
TitleGerman:HALTERUNG EINES RADDREHZAHLSENSORS[2000/02]
English:MOUNTING FOR A WHEEL-SPEED SENSOR[2000/02]
French:FIXATION POUR UN DETECTEUR DE VITESSE DE ROTATION DE ROUE[2000/02]
Entry into regional phase25.10.1999National basic fee paid 
25.10.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
25.10.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure28.08.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
25.10.1999Examination requested  [2000/02]
26.03.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.05.2003Fee for grant paid
10.05.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)18.06.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/37]
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.02.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
27.02.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
27.02.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
26.02.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipNL17.09.2003
ES28.12.2003
BE31.03.2004
[2005/14]
Former [2004/46]NL17.09.2003
ES28.12.2003
Former [2004/13]NL17.09.2003
Cited inInternational search[A]DE4230043  (KNORR BREMSE AG) [A] 1 * column 2, line 16 - column 3, line 22; figures 3,4 *;
 [A]DE2248274  (ALLG IND COMMERZ WALTER VON WE) [A] 1 * page 4, line 4 - page 5, line 13; figure 1 *;
 [A]US4864231  (OKUMURA TSUYOSHI ET AL) [A] 1 * column A; figures 1,2 *;
 [A]EP0092605  (WABCO WESTINGHOUSE FAHRZEUG) [A] 1 * abstract *;
 [A]US4161120  (CLOAREC JEAN-CLAUDE) [A] 1 * column A; figure 1 *
ExaminationDE2111499