Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0973371

EP0973371 - PLUCKING MEMBER FOR A CORN-LIKE FRUIT HARVESTING MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  28.03.2002
Database last updated on 20.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip28.03.2002Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 15.05.2002  [2002/20]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Carl Geringhoff GmbH & Co KG
Nordstrasse 54
D-59227 Ahlen / DE
[2000/04]
Inventor(s)01 / HANSMEIER, Reinhard
Augustin-Wibbelt-Strasse 30
D-59227 Ahlen / DE
[2000/04]
Representative(s)Habbel, Hans-Georg
Habbel & Habbel
Patentanwälte
Am Kanonengraben 11
48151 Münster / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/04]Habbel, Hans-Georg, Dipl.-Ing.
Habbel & Habbel, Patentanwälte, Am Kanonengraben 11
48151 Münster / DE
Application number, filing date98910588.707.02.1998
[2000/04]
WO1998DE00351
Priority number, dateDE199711462309.04.1997         Original published format: DE 19714623
[2000/04]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9844775
Date:15.10.1998
Language:DE
[1998/41]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0973371
Date:26.01.2000
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.10.1998
[2000/04]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP15.10.1998
ClassificationInternational:A01D45/02
[2000/04]
Designated contracting statesBE,   FR,   IT [2000/04]
TitleGerman:PFLÜCKVORSATZ FÜR EIN ERNTEGERÄT ZUM ERNTEN VON KÖRNERFRÜCHTEN[2000/04]
English:PLUCKING MEMBER FOR A CORN-LIKE FRUIT HARVESTING MACHINE[2000/04]
French:ORGANE CUEILLEUR POUR APPAREIL A RECOLTER DES FRUITS EN FORME DE GRAINS[2000/04]
Entry into regional phase07.09.1999National basic fee paid 
07.09.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
07.09.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.07.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
07.09.1999Examination requested  [2000/04]
05.03.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
18.03.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.03.2002Application withdrawn by applicant  [2002/20]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.12.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
27.02.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
19.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[PX]DE29713324U  (GERINGHOFF CARL GMBH CO KG [DE]) [PX] 1,3 * the whole document *;
 [DA]EP0474072  (PICK NORBERT [DE]) [DA] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2103002  (RUDOLPH FABER JOHN)
by applicantDE4344669
 DE9403265U
 EP0474072