Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0969849

EP0969849 - STABLE SOLID PREPARATION CONTAINING VITAMIN D3 AND TRICALCIUM PHOSPHATE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  28.05.2004
Database last updated on 22.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip02.05.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): GR
published on 04.06.2008  [2008/23]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Merck Patent GmbH
Postfach
64271 Darmstadt / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/02]For all designated states
MERCK PATENT GmbH
64271 Darmstadt / DE
Inventor(s)01 / SCHÄFFLER, Achim
Schillerstrasse 7
D-64743 Beerfelden / DE
02 / WILDNER, Claudia
Darmstädter Strasse 278a
D-64625 Bensheim / DE
[2000/02]
Application number, filing date98910722.204.03.1998
[2000/02]
WO1998EP01208
Priority number, dateDE199711005412.03.1997         Original published format: DE 19710054
[2000/02]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9840085
Date:17.09.1998
Language:DE
[1998/37]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0969849
Date:12.01.2000
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.09.1998
[2000/02]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0969849
Date:23.07.2003
Language:DE
[2003/30]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP17.09.1998
ClassificationInternational:A61K33/06, A61K31/59, // (A61K33/06, 31:59, A61P19:08, 19:10)
[2003/06]
Former International [2000/02]A61K33/06, A61K31/59, // (A61K33/06, 31:59)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/02]
Extension statesLT08.09.1999
LV08.09.1999
RO08.09.1999
SI08.09.1999
TitleGerman:STABILE, FESTE ZUBEREITUNG ENTHALTEND VITAMIN D3 UND TRICALCIUMPHOSPHAT[2000/02]
English:STABLE SOLID PREPARATION CONTAINING VITAMIN D3 AND TRICALCIUM PHOSPHATE[2000/02]
French:COMPOSITION SOLIDE STABLE CONTENANT DE LA VITAMINE D3 ET DU PHOSPHATE TRICALCIQUE[2000/02]
Entry into regional phase08.09.1999National basic fee paid 
08.09.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
08.09.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure22.09.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
08.09.1999Examination requested  [2000/02]
27.03.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
31.07.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.08.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03)
30.08.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.09.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
25.09.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.10.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
08.11.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.01.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.04.2003Fee for grant paid
28.04.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)26.04.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/29]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
16.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
13.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
11.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipGR23.07.2003
SE05.03.2004
[2008/23]
Former [2004/52]SE05.03.2004
Cited inInternational search[X]WO9609036  (INNOTHERA LAB SA [FR], et al) [X] 1-8 *siehe insbesondere Ansprüche 1, 4-6, 15-17; p. 10 *;
 [X]EP0588539  (TEVA PHARMA [IL]) [X] 1,3,6-8 *siehe insbesondere Ansprüche 1-3,6,10-12; Seite 4, Zeile 40 - Seite 5, Zeile 11 *;
 [DA]EP0413828  (TEIJIN LTD [JP]) [DA] 1 * siehe insbesondere Ansprüche 1,4; Tabellen 1-2; *
 [X]  - CHAPUY ET AL., "Vitamin D3 and calcium to prevent hip fructures in the elderly women", NEW ENGLAND J MEDICINE, (1992), vol. 327, no. 23, pages 1637 - 1642, XP002069715 [X] 1,2,7,8 * siehe insbesondere Zusammenfassung, und p. 1637 "Study Design and Supplements " *