Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0969727

EP0969727 - MACHINE FOR THE AUTOMATIC PRODUCTION OF MEAT OR VEGETABLE BROCHETTES SPITTED ON WOODEN PICKS IN PARTICULAR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  22.08.2003
Database last updated on 24.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip22.08.2003Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 08.10.2003  [2003/41]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Emsens, Michel
Z.A. du Parc
42490 Fraisses / FR
[2000/02]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[2000/02]
Representative(s)Thivillier, Patrick , et al
Cabinet Laurent & Charras
3 Place de l'Hôtel de Ville
B.P. 203
42005 Saint-Etienne Cedex 1 / FR
[N/P]
Former [2000/02]Thivillier, Patrick , et al
Cabinet Laurent & Charras, 3 Place de l'Hôtel de Ville, B.P. 203
42005 Saint-Etienne Cédex / FR
Application number, filing date98910811.323.02.1998
[2000/02]
WO1998FR00348
Priority number, dateFR1997000351618.03.1997         Original published format: FR 9703516
[2000/02]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9841100
Date:24.09.1998
Language:FR
[1998/38]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0969727
Date:12.01.2000
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.09.1998
[2000/02]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP24.09.1998
ClassificationInternational:A22C17/00
[2000/02]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   GB,   GR,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   PT [2000/02]
TitleGerman:MASCHINE ZUR AUTOMATISCHEN HERSTELLUNG VON FLEISCH- ODER GEMÜSESPIESSEN[2000/02]
English:MACHINE FOR THE AUTOMATIC PRODUCTION OF MEAT OR VEGETABLE BROCHETTES SPITTED ON WOODEN PICKS IN PARTICULAR[2000/02]
French:MACHINE POUR LA FABRICATION AUTOMATIQUE DE BROCHETTES DE VIANDE OU DE LEGUMES ENFILEES SUR DES PIQUES EN BOIS NOTAMMENT[2000/02]
Entry into regional phase15.06.1999National basic fee paid 
15.06.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
15.06.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure19.09.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
15.06.1999Examination requested  [2000/02]
28.10.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.03.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2003/41]
12.05.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2003/41]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.02.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
07.02.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
09.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
28.02.200306   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[DA]FR2574252  (SOCOPRAL [FR]) [DA] 1 * claim 1 *;
 [A]EP0113637  (EMSENS ANTOINE SARL [FR]) [A] 8-10 * page 4, line 2 - page 5, line 4 * * page 9, line 15 - page 10, line 14 *;
 [A]FR2668895  (NIJAL [FR]);
 [A]WO9611579  (EMSENS MICHEL [FR]);
 [A]US4842181  (WALSER GLENN E [US]);
 [A]EP0230841  (EMSENS ANTOINE SARL [FR]);
 [DA]FR2665336  (EMSENS MICHEL);
 [DA]FR2535169  (TOLERIE SUISSE [FR])
by applicantEP0278879
 EP0278179