Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0968323

EP0968323 - COMPOSITIONS BASED ON SALTS OF MERCAPTO ACIDS AND IMIDAZOLINES AS INHIBITORS OF CARBONIC CORROSION OF IRON AND FERROUS METALS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2000/01]SULPHYDRYL ACID AND IMIDAZOLINE SALTS AS INHIBITORS OF CARBON CORROSION OF IRON AND FERROUS METALS
[2000/40]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  22.03.2002
Database last updated on 18.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip19.11.2004Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): GR
published on 05.01.2005  [2005/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
CECA S.A.
4 - 8, Cours Michelet, La Défense 10
92800 Puteaux / FR
[N/P]
Former [2000/01]For all designated states
CECA S.A.
4 - 8, Cours Michelet, La Défense 10
92800 Puteaux / FR
Inventor(s)01 / POU, Tong, Eak
1, chemin de l'Oiseleur
F-95800 Courdimanche / FR
02 / FOUQUAY, Stéphane
7, parc de la Saâne
F-76130 Mont Saint-Aignan / FR
[2000/01]
Representative(s)Treuil, Claude , et al
ARKEMA Département Propriété Industrielle 4-8, cours Michelet, La Défense 10
92091 Paris La Défense Cedex / FR
[N/P]
Former [2001/42]Treuil, Claude , et al
Atofina Département Propriété Industrielle 4-8 cours Michelet La Défense 10
92091 Paris La Défense Cedex / FR
Former [2000/01]Ohresser, François
Elf Atochem S.A. Direction Centrale Recherche & Développement Département Propriété Industrielle Cours Michelet La Défense 10
92091 Paris La Défense Cedex / FR
Application number, filing date98910813.904.03.1998
[2000/01]
WO1998FR00351
Priority number, dateFR1997000328618.03.1997         Original published format: FR 9703286
FR1998000122603.02.1998         Original published format: FR 9801226
[2000/01]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9841673
Date:24.09.1998
Language:FR
[1998/38]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0968323
Date:05.01.2000
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.09.1998
[2000/01]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0968323
Date:16.05.2001
Language:FR
[2001/20]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP24.09.1998
ClassificationInternational:C23F11/10, E21B41/02
[2000/01]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/01]
TitleGerman:ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN AUF DER BASIS VON SALZEN VON MERCAPTOSÄUREN UND IMIDAZOLINEN ALS KOHLENSÄURE-KORROSIONSINHIBITOREN FÜR EISEN UND EISENLEGIERUNGEN[2000/40]
English:COMPOSITIONS BASED ON SALTS OF MERCAPTO ACIDS AND IMIDAZOLINES AS INHIBITORS OF CARBONIC CORROSION OF IRON AND FERROUS METALS[2000/40]
French:COMPOSITIONS A BASE DE SELS DE MERCAPTOACIDES ET D'IMIDAZOLINES COMME INHIBITEURS DE LA CORROSION CARBONIQUE DU FER ET DES METAUX FERREUX[2000/40]
Former [2000/01]SALZE VON MERCAPTOSÄUREN UND IMIDAZLINEN ALS KOHLENSTOFFDIOXIDKORROSIONINHIBITORENFÜR EISEN UND EISENLEGIERUNGEN
Former [2000/01]SULPHYDRYL ACID AND IMIDAZOLINE SALTS AS INHIBITORS OF CARBON CORROSION OF IRON AND FERROUS METALS
Former [2000/01]SELS DE MERCAPTOACIDES ET D'IMIDAZOLINES COMME INHIBITEURS DE LA CORROSION CARBONIQUE DU FER ET DES METAUX FERREUX
Entry into regional phase14.09.1999National basic fee paid 
14.09.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
14.09.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure23.09.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
14.09.1999Examination requested  [2000/01]
25.09.2000Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
10.11.2000Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.01.2001Fee for grant paid
15.01.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)19.02.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2002/19]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
16.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFI16.05.2001
IE16.05.2001
DK16.08.2001
PT16.08.2001
SE16.08.2001
GR17.08.2001
ES30.11.2001
[2005/01]
Former [2004/04]FI16.05.2001
IE16.05.2001
DK16.08.2001
PT16.08.2001
SE16.08.2001
ES30.11.2001
Former [2003/46]AT16.05.2001
FI16.05.2001
IE16.05.2001
DK16.08.2001
PT16.08.2001
SE16.08.2001
Former [2002/48]AT16.05.2001
FI16.05.2001
IE16.05.2001
PT16.08.2001
SE16.08.2001
Former [2002/27]AT16.05.2001
FI16.05.2001
PT16.08.2001
SE16.08.2001
Former [2002/15]AT16.05.2001
FI16.05.2001
SE16.08.2001
Former [2002/14]AT16.05.2001
SE16.08.2001
Former [2002/05]SE16.08.2001
Cited inInternational search[XY]US2865817  (CLAUSEN IRVIN A) [X] 1-3,7 * example XXVI; table III * * example XXVI; table III * [Y] 4;
 [Y]US4339349  (MARTIN RICHARD L, et al) [Y] 4 * column 20, lines 22-35; claim 1 * * column 9, lines 1-13 *;
 [A]US3300333  (ANNE PAGE MARY) [A] 1 * examples 1,2 *;
 [A]SU732258  ;
 [L]SU732258  (ZHUKOV IVAN N [SU], et al) [L] 1 * Brevet original de l'abrégé précédent.; column 1, paragraph 1 *;
 [A]US3775320  (VIGO M, et al) [A] 1 * claim 1 *;
 [A]US3629104  (MADDOX JIM JR) [A] 1,7 * column 1, lines 14-16; claim 1 *;
 [E]GB2319530  (NALCO EXXON ENERGY CHEM LP [US]) [E] 1,7 * claim 1 *
 [A]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 80, no. 51, Database accession no. 80-91773C, XP002048705 & SU732258 A 19800508 (ZHUKOV I N) [A] 1 * abstract *