Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP0994963 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0994963



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 744
10.05.2012 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
10.05.2012 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
04.05.2012 Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent Opposition 2
23.04.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
23.04.2012 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
23.04.2012 French translation of claims Opposition 2
23.04.2012 German translation of the claims Opposition 3
23.04.2012 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
14.03.2012 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant Search / examination 1
12.03.2012 Submission concerning representation Search / examination 1
07.02.2012 Communication of bibliographic data Opposition 1
07.02.2012 Communication to opponent concerning maintenance Opposition 2
07.02.2012 Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations Opposition 2
02.02.2012 Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision Opposition 1
05.01.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
05.01.2012 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 1
05.01.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
28.12.2011 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
28.12.2011 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 1
28.12.2011 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
27.12.2011 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
19.12.2011 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 31
20.09.2011 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
13.09.2011 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
13.09.2011 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Appeal 2
13.09.2011 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
02.03.2011 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
24.02.2011 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
24.02.2011 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
24.02.2011 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 5
28.01.2011 F3080 Communication regarding observations by third parties Appeal 1
28.01.2011 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
20.01.2011 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 1
19.01.2011 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
19.01.2011 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 1
19.01.2011 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
19.01.2011 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
18.01.2011 Receipt of third party observations during the appeal procedure Appeal 11
12.01.2011 F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing Appeal 2
10.01.2011 F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing Appeal 1
30.12.2010 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
23.12.2010 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
20.12.2010 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 4
16.12.2010 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 5
26.11.2010 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
23.11.2010 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
23.11.2010 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
23.11.2010 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
11.11.2010 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 1
27.10.2010 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
22.10.2010 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 16
19.10.2010 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
19.10.2010 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
24.02.2010 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 2
08.02.2010 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
29.01.2010 F3057 Communication: Change of responsibility of a Board of Appeal Appeal 2
07.12.2007 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
22.11.2007 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 10
31.08.2007 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 2
24.08.2007 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
23.08.2007 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 2
16.05.2007 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
30.04.2007 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 13
30.04.2007 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
30.04.2007 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
30.04.2007 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 9
25.04.2007 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 28
05.03.2007 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
02.02.2007 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 1
02.02.2007 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 2
22.01.2007 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
03.01.2007 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
29.12.2006 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
29.12.2006 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
19.12.2006 Druckexemplar in opposition procedure Opposition 22
19.12.2006 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 23
28.11.2006 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
26.07.2006 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
26.07.2006 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
25.07.2006 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
25.07.2006 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
21.07.2006 Claims Opposition 2
21.07.2006 Claims Opposition 2
21.07.2006 Claims Opposition 2
21.07.2006 Claims Opposition 2
21.07.2006 Claims Opposition 2
21.07.2006 Claims Opposition 2
21.07.2006 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 5
21.07.2006 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 5
21.07.2006 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
21.07.2006 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
21.07.2006 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
21.07.2006 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
26.05.2006 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
26.05.2006 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
19.05.2006 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
17.05.2006 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
11.05.2006 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 8
05.05.2006 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
30.11.2004 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
16.11.2004 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 19
16.11.2004 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
22.09.2004 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
22.09.2004 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
13.09.2004 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
30.07.2004 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
20.07.2004 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
23.03.2004 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
23.03.2004 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
26.02.2004 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
13.02.2004 Filing of a new opposition Opposition 25
13.02.2004 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
13.02.2004 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
13.02.2004 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
13.02.2004 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
13.02.2004 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
13.02.2004 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
13.02.2004 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
13.02.2004 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
13.02.2004 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
13.02.2004 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
13.02.2004 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
13.02.2004 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
13.02.2004 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
13.02.2004 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
13.02.2004 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
13.02.2004 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
13.02.2004 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 14
13.02.2004 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
13.02.2004 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
13.02.2004 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
13.02.2004 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
13.02.2004 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
13.02.2004 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
13.02.2004 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 11
13.02.2004 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
13.02.2004 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 14
13.02.2004 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 15
11.02.2004 Filing of a new opposition Opposition 26
03.04.2003 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
11.12.2002 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 2
11.12.2002 Translation of the claims Search / examination 3
11.12.2002 Translation of the claims Search / examination 2
16.09.2002 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
28.08.2002 Request for change of address Search / examination 1
13.08.2002 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
13.08.2002 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
13.08.2002 Text intended for grant Search / examination 45
22.07.2002 Preparation of grant Search / examination 2
21.06.2002 Claims Search / examination 2
21.06.2002 Claims Search / examination 3
21.06.2002 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
20.06.2002 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 8
11.02.2002 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
11.02.2002 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
26.11.2001 Claims Search / examination 5
26.11.2001 Claims Search / examination 3
26.11.2001 Description Search / examination 6
26.11.2001 Description Search / examination 5
13.03.2001 Submission concerning representation Search / examination 1
07.07.2000 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
23.06.2000 Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure Search / examination 1
10.06.2000 Request concerning the applicant/representative Search / examination 1
15.03.2000 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
10.03.2000 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
10.03.2000 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
21.02.2000 Request concerning the applicant/representative Search / examination 1
18.02.2000 Request concerning the applicant/representative Search / examination 1
08.10.1999 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
04.10.1999 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
11.01.1999 Copy of the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 5
15.12.1998 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
02.11.1998 Priority document Search / examination 16
01.09.1998 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
01.09.1998 International publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 47