Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0971893

EP0971893 - CYANO SUBSTITUTED CYCLOALKANES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  22.03.2002
Database last updated on 27.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip22.03.2002Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 08.05.2002  [2002/19]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Syngenta Limited
Fernhurst
Haslemere
Surrey GU27 3JE / GB
[N/P]
Former [2001/13]For all designated states
Syngenta Limited
Fernhurst
Haselmere, Surrey GU27 3JE / GB
Former [2000/03]For all designated states
ZENECA LIMITED
15 Stanhope Gate
London W1Y 6LN / GB
Inventor(s)01 / PEARSON, David, Philip, John
Jealott's Hill Research Station
Bracknell, Berkshire RG42 6ET / GB
02 / URCH, Christopher, John
Jealott's Hill Research Station
Bracknell, Berkshire RG42 6ET / GB
03 / SALMON, Roger
Jealott's Hill Research Station
Bracknell, Berkshire RG42 6ET / GB
04 / FINNEY, John
Jealott's Hill Research Station
Bracknell, Berkshire RG42 6ET / GB
05 / HUGGETT, Mark, Adrian
Jealott's Hill Research Station
Bracknell, Berkshire RG42 6ET / GB
[2000/03]
Representative(s)Waterman, John Richard , et al
Syngenta Limited - IP Department Jealott's Hill International Research Centre P.O. Box 3538 Bracknell
Berkshire RG42 6YA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/28]Waterman, John Richard , et al
Intellectual Property Department, ZENECA Agrochemicals, Jealott's Hill Research Station, P.O. Box 3538
Bracknell, Berkshire RG42 6YA / GB
Former [2000/17]Gaal, Jozsef Christopher , et al
Intellectual Property Department, Jealott's Hill Research Station, PO Box 3538
Bracknell, Berkshire RG42 6YA / GB
Former [2000/03]Tierney, Francis John , et al
Intellectual Property Department, ZENECA Agrochemicals, Jealotts Hill Research Station, P.O. Box 3538
Bracknell, Berkshire RG42 6YA / GB
Application number, filing date98910859.205.03.1998
[2000/03]
WO1998GB00718
Priority number, dateGB1997000657401.04.1997         Original published format: GB 9706574
[2000/03]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9843957
Date:08.10.1998
Language:EN
[1998/40]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0971893
Date:19.01.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.10.1998
[2000/03]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP08.10.1998
ClassificationInternational:C07D213/61, C07D213/57, C07C255/46, C07D239/26, C07D241/16, C07D213/65, C07D277/64, C07D263/56, A01N43/40, A01N43/48, A01N37/34, A01N43/74
[2000/03]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/03]
TitleGerman:CYANO-SUBSTITUIERTE CYCLOALKANE[2000/03]
English:CYANO SUBSTITUTED CYCLOALKANES[2000/03]
French:CYCLOALCANES CYANO SUBSTITUES[2000/03]
Entry into regional phase02.11.1999National basic fee paid 
02.11.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
02.11.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure20.07.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
02.11.1999Examination requested  [2000/03]
02.10.2001Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2002/19]
08.11.2001Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2002/19]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.200104   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[A]WO9637494  (ZENECA LTD) [A] 1,7-9 * claims 1-12 *;
 [A]EP0035972  (CIBA-GEIGY AG) [A] 1 * see page 11, table, compounds 18-19 *;
 [A]US3759974  (KNOLL AG CHEMISCHE FABRIKEN)