Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0968099

EP0968099 - VEHICLE COMPONENTS INCORPORATING ACUSTIC RADIATOR PANEL-FORM LOUDSPEAKERS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2000/01]PASSENGER VEHICLES INCORPORATING LOUDSPEAKERS COMPRISING PANEL-FORM ACOUSTIC RADIATING ELEMENTS
[2001/38]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  30.05.2003
Database last updated on 18.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip07.03.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 09.04.2008  [2008/15]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
New Transducers Limited
37 Ixworth Place
London SW3 3QH / GB
[2000/19]
Former [2000/01]For all designated states
New Transducers Limited
Stonehill
Huntingdon, Cambridgeshire PE18 6ED / GB
Inventor(s)01 / AZIMA, Henry
3 Southcare Close Chaucer Road
Cambridge CB2 2TT / GB
02 / COLLOMS, Martin
22 Burgess Hill
London NW2 2DA / GB
03 / ELLIS, Christian
Briar Cottage 3 Barley Road
Great Chishill Hertfordshire SG8 8SB / GB
[2000/01]
Representative(s)Hill, Justin John , et al
Ipulse (IP) Ltd.
Carrington House
126-130 Regent Street
London W1B 5SE / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/01]Greene, Simon Kenneth
Maguire Boss, 5 Crown Street
St. Ives, Cambridgeshire PE17 4EB / GB
Application number, filing date98910886.519.03.1998
[2000/01]
WO1998GB00835
Priority number, dateGB1997000597922.03.1997         Original published format: GB 9705979
[2000/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9842536
Date:01.10.1998
Language:EN
[1998/39]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0968099
Date:05.01.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.10.1998
[2000/01]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0968099
Date:24.07.2002
Language:EN
[2002/30]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP01.10.1998
ClassificationInternational:B60R11/02
[2000/01]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   IE,   IT,   LI,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/01]
Extension statesLT16.09.1999
LV16.09.1999
RO16.09.1999
SI16.09.1999
TitleGerman:KOMPONENTE EINES PERSONENWAGEN MIT LAUTSPRECHER DIE ALS PANEELFÖRMIGE AKUSTISCHE ABSTRAHLELEMENTE GESTALTET SIND[2001/38]
English:VEHICLE COMPONENTS INCORPORATING ACUSTIC RADIATOR PANEL-FORM LOUDSPEAKERS[2001/38]
French:PIECES DE VEHICULE EQUIPES DE HAUT-PARLEURS MUNIS D'ELEMENTS RADIANTS ACOUSTIQUES EN FORME DE PANNEAU[2001/38]
Former [2000/01]PERSONENWAGEN MIT LAUTSPRECHER DIE ALS PANEELFÖRMIGE AKUSTISCHE ABSTRAHLELEMENTE GESTALTET SIND
Former [2000/01]PASSENGER VEHICLES INCORPORATING LOUDSPEAKERS COMPRISING PANEL-FORM ACOUSTIC RADIATING ELEMENTS
Former [2000/01]VEHICULES DE TOURISME EQUIPES DE HAUT-PARLEURS MUNIS D'ELEMENTS RADIANTS ACOUSTIQUES EN FORME DE PANNEAU
Entry into regional phase16.09.1999National basic fee paid 
16.09.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
16.09.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure15.10.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
16.09.1999Examination requested  [2000/01]
05.12.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
30.05.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.09.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
22.11.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
29.01.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.04.2002Fee for grant paid
15.04.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)25.04.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/29]
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.09.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
09.02.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
02.02.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT24.07.2002
BE24.07.2002
CH24.07.2002
FI24.07.2002
IT24.07.2002
LI24.07.2002
DK24.10.2002
PT24.10.2002
IE19.03.2003
[2008/15]
Former [2005/21]AT24.07.2002
BE24.07.2002
CH24.07.2002
FI24.07.2002
LI24.07.2002
DK24.10.2002
PT24.10.2002
IE19.03.2003
Former [2004/15]AT24.07.2002
BE24.07.2002
CH24.07.2002
LI24.07.2002
DK24.10.2002
PT24.10.2002
IE19.03.2003
Former [2003/48]AT24.07.2002
BE24.07.2002
CH24.07.2002
LI24.07.2002
DK24.10.2002
PT24.10.2002
Former [2003/46]AT24.07.2002
CH24.07.2002
LI24.07.2002
DK24.10.2002
PT24.10.2002
Former [2003/31]AT24.07.2002
CH24.07.2002
LI24.07.2002
PT24.10.2002
Former [2003/22]PT24.10.2002
Cited inInternational search[DY]WO9709861  (VERITY GROUP PLC [GB], et al) [DY] 1,9,11 * page 11, line 22 - page 12, line 8 *;
 [Y]GB2281836  (PRINCE CORP [US]) [Y] 1,9,11 * page 7, line 30 - page 9, line 1 *;
 [DA]WO9709858  (VERITY GROUP PLC [GB], et al) [DA] 1,11 * page 5, line 5 - page 6, line 3 *;
 [A]EP0411786  (BOSE CORP [US]) [A] 1,4,6,8,11,15,18 * column 2, line 33 - line 51 *;
 [A]DE4328720  (OPEL ADAM AG [DE]) [A] 1,4,5,11 * column 2, line 12 - line 26 *;
 [A]US4362907  (POLACSEK DAVID D) [A] 1,11,13,14 * column 3, line 20 - line 54 *;
 [A]DE3603198  (LEYSER ULRICH) [A] 1,9,11 * figure 1 *;
 [A]DE19638189  (TOP SOURCE TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [A] 1,11 * column 2, line 44 - column 3, line 44 *;
 [DA]WO9709859  (VERITY GROUP PLC [GB], et al) [DA] 1,11 * the whole document *