Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP0975724 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0975724



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 953
30.10.2014 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
30.10.2014 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
24.10.2014 Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent Opposition 2
14.10.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
14.10.2014 Filing of the translation of the amended claims Opposition 2
14.10.2014 French translation of claims Opposition 4
14.10.2014 German translation of the claims Opposition 4
31.07.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
31.07.2014 Communication confirming withdrawal from representation Opposition 1
31.07.2014 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Opposition 2
21.07.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
21.07.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
10.07.2014 Communication of bibliographic data Opposition 2
10.07.2014 Communication to opponent concerning maintenance Opposition 2
10.07.2014 Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations Opposition 3
15.05.2014 Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision Opposition 2
30.05.2011 Submission concerning representation Search / examination 2
01.12.2010 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
29.11.2010 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
26.11.2010 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
26.11.2010 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
23.11.2010 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
23.11.2010 Druckexemplar in opposition procedure Opposition 32
23.11.2010 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 3
23.11.2010 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 2
23.11.2010 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
22.11.2010 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
22.11.2010 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
17.11.2010 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Opposition 1
15.11.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
10.11.2010 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
10.11.2010 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Opposition 1
10.11.2010 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
10.11.2010 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
27.10.2010 Submission concerning representation Opposition 2
25.10.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
21.10.2010 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
19.10.2010 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
14.10.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
11.10.2010 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
11.10.2010 Description Opposition 7
11.10.2010 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
11.10.2010 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
16.09.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
08.09.2010 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
30.07.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
29.07.2010 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
27.07.2010 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
23.07.2010 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
17.07.2010 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
17.07.2010 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
13.07.2010 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 1
13.07.2010 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
13.07.2010 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
13.07.2010 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
13.07.2010 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
17.06.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
15.06.2010 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 3
11.06.2010 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 3
27.04.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
21.04.2010 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
21.04.2010 Description Opposition 1
21.04.2010 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
21.04.2010 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 1
13.04.2010 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 1
13.04.2010 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 2
13.04.2010 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
16.03.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
10.03.2010 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
10.03.2010 Description Opposition 4
10.03.2010 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
10.03.2010 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 1
14.01.2010 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 1
14.01.2010 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 2
14.01.2010 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
02.04.2009 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
02.04.2009 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
30.03.2009 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
25.03.2009 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 25
03.12.2008 F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters Appeal 2
02.12.2008 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
24.11.2008 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
07.11.2008 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
03.11.2008 Communication (no form) Appeal 2
30.10.2008 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
29.10.2008 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 6
28.10.2008 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 4
28.10.2008 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 6
20.10.2008 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
16.10.2008 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
16.10.2008 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
13.10.2008 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 4
01.10.2008 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
03.07.2008 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Appeal 15
11.10.2006 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
02.10.2006 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 13
02.10.2006 Claims Appeal 3
02.10.2006 Claims Appeal 3
02.10.2006 Claims Appeal 2
02.10.2006 Claims Appeal 3
02.10.2006 Claims Appeal 3
02.10.2006 Claims Appeal 3
02.10.2006 Description Appeal 5
02.10.2006 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 15
01.08.2006 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
23.05.2006 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
16.05.2006 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 23
16.05.2006 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 42
16.05.2006 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 13
27.04.2006 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
10.04.2006 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 2
06.04.2006 Brief communication to applicant/representative Appeal 1
04.04.2006 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
04.04.2006 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
03.04.2006 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
03.04.2006 Processing of an appeal Appeal 1
31.03.2006 Notice of appeal Appeal 3
15.02.2006 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
11.02.2006 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
07.02.2006 Annex to a communication Opposition 4
07.02.2006 Annex to a communication Opposition 3
07.02.2006 Annex to the communication Opposition 7
07.02.2006 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Opposition 12
07.02.2006 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 2
07.02.2006 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
07.02.2006 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
07.02.2006 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
07.02.2006 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 2
07.02.2006 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
07.02.2006 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Opposition 1
07.02.2006 Text intended for grant Opposition 32
20.01.2006 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 1
03.01.2006 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
23.12.2005 Request for change of opponent's representative Opposition 2
24.11.2005 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
17.11.2005 Claims Opposition 3
17.11.2005 Claims Opposition 3
17.11.2005 Claims Opposition 3
17.11.2005 Claims Opposition 3
17.11.2005 Claims Opposition 2
17.11.2005 Description Opposition 18
17.11.2005 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 13
17.11.2005 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
17.11.2005 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 8
02.11.2005 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 2
02.11.2005 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Opposition 1
11.10.2005 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 2
07.10.2005 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
30.09.2005 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
30.09.2005 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
30.09.2005 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
30.09.2005 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
30.09.2005 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 2
11.07.2005 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
08.07.2005 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
25.06.2005 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
23.06.2005 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
22.06.2005 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
17.06.2005 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
14.06.2005 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 3
14.06.2005 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 2
30.05.2005 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
10.05.2005 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
02.05.2005 Description Opposition 19
02.05.2005 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
01.05.2005 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
24.02.2005 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
16.02.2005 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 11
23.12.2004 Annex to the communication Opposition 7
23.12.2004 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 2
16.12.2004 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 1
09.07.2004 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
30.06.2004 Claims Opposition 3
30.06.2004 Claims Opposition 2
30.06.2004 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 5
28.06.2004 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 11
29.04.2004 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
29.04.2004 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
23.04.2004 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
21.04.2004 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 2
17.12.2003 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
17.12.2003 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
25.09.2003 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
17.09.2003 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
17.09.2003 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
17.09.2003 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
17.09.2003 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
17.09.2003 Notice of opposition Opposition 11
17.09.2003 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 13
17.09.2003 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
17.09.2003 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
17.09.2003 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
17.09.2003 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
07.01.2003 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
18.11.2002 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
18.11.2002 Translation of the claims Search / examination 4
18.11.2002 Translation of the claims Search / examination 4
20.08.2002 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 3
12.08.2002 Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
19.06.2002 Grant of extension of time limit Search / examination 1
11.06.2002 Request for extension of time limit to announcement of intention to grant Search / examination 1
05.02.2002 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
05.02.2002 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 3
05.02.2002 Text intended for grant Search / examination 64
02.07.2001 Decision to allow further processing Search / examination 1
13.06.2001 Annex Search / examination 4
13.06.2001 Claims Search / examination 2
13.06.2001 Description Search / examination 4
13.06.2001 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 6
16.05.2001 Application deemed to be withdrawn (reply to communication from Examining Division too late) Search / examination 1
07.05.2001 Annex Search / examination 4
07.05.2001 Claims Search / examination 2
07.05.2001 Description Search / examination 4
07.05.2001 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 6
04.05.2001 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 17
14.03.2001 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
23.02.2001 Letter filed during examination procedure after communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
24.10.2000 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
24.10.2000 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
28.08.2000 Request for accelerated examination Search / examination 1
22.12.1999 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
25.10.1999 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
25.10.1999 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 6
21.06.1999 Copy of the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 7
03.02.1999 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
19.11.1998 Priority document Search / examination 64
13.10.1998 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
13.10.1998 International publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 65