blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0971000

EP0971000 - ELECTRONIC/ELECTRIC COMPONENTS USED IN CLEAN ROOM AND SUBSTRATE TREATMENT APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  01.07.2005
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip26.09.2008Change - representativepublished on 29.10.2008  [2008/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
TOKYO ELECTRON LIMITED
3-6 Akasaka, 5-chome, Minato-ku
Tokyo 107-8481 / JP
For all designated states
TAISEI CORPORATION
1-25-1 Nishi-shinjuku, Shinjuku-ku
Tokyo 163-0606 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/02]For all designated states
Tokyo Electron Limited
3-6 Akasaka, 5-chome, Minato-ku
Tokyo 107-8481 / JP
For all designated states
Taisei Corporation
1-25-1 Nishi-shinjuku, Shinjuku-ku
Tokyo 163-0606 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / MATSUO, Takenobu
Grand-Heights 404 8-18-4, Kokubo Kofu-shi
Yamanashi-ken 400-0043 / JP
02 / WAKABAYASHI, Tsuyoshi
1-4-4, Ote Kofu-shi
Yamanashi-ken 400-0015 / JP
03 / SAITO, Misako
1035, Sawanobori Kushigatamachi Nakakoma-gun
Yamanashi-ken 400-0302 / JP
04 / KOBAYASHI, Sadao
4-13-11, Hongodai Sakae-ku Yokohama-shi
Kanagawa-ken 247-0008 / JP
05 / WAKAYAMA, Yoshihide
4-10-22, Higashikaigankita Chigasaki-shi
Kanagawa-ken 253-0053 / JP
06 / IMAFUKU, Masayuki
884-1-236, Kamikuratacho Totsuka-ku Yokohama-shi
Kanagawa-ken 244-0816 / JP
[2000/02]
Representative(s)Liesegang, Roland
Boehmert & Boehmert
Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB
Pettenkoferstrasse 22
80336 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/44]Liesegang, Roland
Boehmert & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22
80336 München / DE
Former [2000/02]Liesegang, Roland, Dr.-Ing.
BOEHMERT & BOEHMERT, NORDEMANN und PARTNER Franz-Joseph-Strasse 38
80801 München / DE
Application number, filing date98910973.125.03.1998
[2000/02]
WO1998JP01296
Priority number, dateJP1997007120125.03.1997         Original published format: JP 7120197
[2000/02]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9842783
Date:01.10.1998
Language:EN
[1998/39]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0971000
Date:12.01.2000
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.10.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2000/02]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0971000
Date:25.08.2004
Language:EN
[2004/35]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP01.10.1998
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.06.2000
ClassificationIPC:C08L101/00, C08K5/13, C08K5/05, H01L21/02
[2000/24]
CPC:
C08K5/0075 (EP,US); H01L21/02 (KR)
Former IPC [2000/02]C08L101/00, C08K5/13, C08K5/05
Designated contracting statesDE,   GB,   IT [2000/02]
TitleGerman:ELEKTRONISCHE/ELEKTRISCHE BAUTEILE ZUR VERWENDUNG IN REINRAUM UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM BEHANDELN VON SUBSTRATEN[2000/02]
English:ELECTRONIC/ELECTRIC COMPONENTS USED IN CLEAN ROOM AND SUBSTRATE TREATMENT APPARATUS[2000/02]
French:COMPOSANTS ELECTRONIQUES ET/OU ELECTRIQUES UTILISES EN SALLE BLANCHE ET APPAREIL DE TRAITEMENT DE SUBSTRAT[2000/02]
Entry into regional phase05.10.1999Translation filed 
05.10.1999National basic fee paid 
05.10.1999Search fee paid 
05.10.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
05.10.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure20.08.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP
05.10.1999Examination requested  [2000/02]
05.03.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.06.2004Fee for grant paid
24.06.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)26.05.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/33]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
16.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
13.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
11.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
15.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]JPS6399254  ;
 [Y]EP0436030  (OTSUKA KAGAKU KK [JP]) [Y] 1-22 * page 3, line 42 - page 4, line 17 *;
 [Y]JPH01252667  ;
 [Y]JPS61261316  ;
 [A]JPS6219453
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19880912), vol. 12, no. 338, Database accession no. (C - 527), & JP63099254 A 19880430 (MITSUBISHI PETROCHEM) [X] 1,6-8 * abstract *
    [ ] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1988, no. 39, Database accession no. 158464 [ ] * abstract *
 [Y]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19891227), vol. 13, no. 595, Database accession no. (C - 672), & JP01252667 A 00000000 (TOSHIBA CHEM CORP) [Y] 1-22 * abstract *
 [Y]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19870417), vol. 11, no. 124, Database accession no. (C - 416), & JP61261316 A 19861119 (HITACHI CHEM CO LTD) [Y] 1-22 * abstract *
    [ ] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1987, no. 01, Database accession no. 2590 [ ] * abstract *
 [A]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1987, no. 10, Database accession no. 67590, XP002136157 & JPS6219453 A 00000000 (MITSUBISHI KASEI VINYL KK) [A] * abstract *
International search[Y]JPS61283640  (SHOWA DENKO KK, et al);
 [Y]JPH0859955  (KANEGAFUCHI CHEMICAL IND);
 [Y]JPH0952992  (DENKI KAGAKU KOGYO KK);
 [T]JPH0995581  (TAISEI CORP);
 [T]JPH0995660  (TAISEI CORP);
 [Y]JPH06220274  (JAPAN SYNTHETIC RUBBER CO LTD);
 [Y]JPH05230350  (KURARAY CO);
 [A]JPH03217467  (FUJITSU LTD);
 [Y]  - FUJII T, ET AL., "SURFACE CONTAMINATION BY ORGANIC COMPOUNDS IN CLEANROOM AIR", KUKI SEIJO - JOURNAL OF JAPAN AIR CLEANING ASSOCIATION., TOKYO., JP, JP, (19950101), ISSN 0023-5032, pages 16 - 21, XP002911742
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.