EP0971158 - REVOLUTION ASSISTING DEVICE FOR A ROTATING BODY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.07.2003 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.09.2003 [2003/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TAKARA, Muneaki 19-20, Oroku 1-chome Naha-shi, Okinawa 901-0152 / JP | [2000/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2000/02] | Representative(s) | Laufhütte, Dieter Lorenz Seidler Gossel Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstrasse 23 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/02] | Laufhütte, Dieter, Dr.-Ing. Lorenz-Seidler-Gossel Widenmayerstrasse 23 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98910981.4 | 25.03.1998 | [2000/02] | WO1998JP01306 | Priority number, date | JP19970071878 | 25.03.1997 Original published format: JP 7187897 | [2000/02] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9843000 | Date: | 01.10.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0971158 | Date: | 12.01.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.10.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 01.10.1998 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.11.2001 | Classification | IPC: | F16H21/18, H02N11/00, F03G3/08 | [2000/02] | CPC: |
H02K53/00 (EP,US);
F16H21/22 (KR);
H02K49/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2000/02] | Title | German: | EINRICHTUNG ZUR UNTERSTüUTZUNG DER DREHBEWEGUNG EINES DREHENDEN KÖRPERS | [2000/02] | English: | REVOLUTION ASSISTING DEVICE FOR A ROTATING BODY | [2000/02] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ASSISTANCE A LA ROTATION POUR CORPS ROTATIF | [2000/02] | Entry into regional phase | 20.09.1999 | Translation filed | 20.09.1999 | National basic fee paid | 20.09.1999 | Search fee paid | 20.09.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.09.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.10.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 20.09.1999 | Examination requested [2000/02] | 06.06.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.12.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/36] | 17.01.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2003/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2003 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH07274481 ; | [A]JPH06133529 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960229), vol. 1996, no. 02, & JP07274481 A 19951020 (KENICHI SAKAGUCHI) [X] 1 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940812), vol. 018, no. 434, Database accession no. (E - 1592), & JP06133529 A 19940513 (AKIRA NOGUCHI) [A] 1,2 * abstract * | International search | [Y]JPH03169275 (OGUCHI ETSUTARO); | [Y]JPS62100292U ; | [A]JPH05126225 (JAPAN STEEL WORKS LTD); | [A]JPH0919176 (MARUKOO KK); | [A]JPH06201010 (CHUO GIKEN KOGYO YUGEN); | [A]WO9307387 (TAKARA MUNEAKI [JP]); | [A]WO9309589 (TAKARA MUNEAKI [JP]) |