EP0972530 - ADSORBENT FOR ELIMINATING HEPATITIS C VIRUS, ADSORBER, AND ADSORPTION METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.04.2008 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.04.2008 | Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit | 18.04.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.05.2008 [2008/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KANEKA CORPORATION 2-4, Nakanoshima 3-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-8288 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2000/03] | For all designated states Kaneka Corporation 2-4, Nakanoshima 3-chome, Kita-ku Osaka 530-8288 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OGINO, Eiji 7-36-5, Nakayamatedori, Chuo-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo 650-0004 / JP | 02 /
NOMURA, Michio 56, Kitazaike, Kakogawacho Kakogawa-shi, Hyogo 675-0031 / JP | 03 /
ASAHI, Takashi 10-6, Tsutsujigaoka 3-chome, Tarumi-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo 655-0853 / JP | 04 /
KANEKO, Shuichi 4-13-21, Izuminomachi Kanazawa-shi, Ishikawa 921-8034 / JP | 05 /
SAKAI, Akito 1-28, Juichiyamachi Kanazawa-shi, Ishikawa 921-8106 / JP | [2000/03] | Representative(s) | Hubert, Philippe, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2000/13] | Hubert, Philippe, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 98910991.3 | 25.03.1998 | [2000/03] | WO1998JP01317 | Priority number, date | JP19970071483 | 25.03.1997 Original published format: JP 7148397 | [2000/03] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9842392 | Date: | 01.10.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0972530 | Date: | 19.01.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.10.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 01.10.1998 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.12.2002 | Classification | IPC: | A61M1/36, B01J20/32 | [2003/05] | CPC: |
A61M1/3633 (EP,KR,US);
C07K17/00 (KR);
A61M1/3679 (EP,KR,US);
B01J20/262 (EP,KR,US);
B01J20/265 (EP,KR,US);
B01J20/28078 (EP,KR,US);
B01J20/3212 (EP,KR,US);
B01J20/3217 (EP,US);
B01J20/3219 (EP,KR,US);
B01J20/3255 (EP,KR,US);
B01J20/3274 (EP,KR,US);
A61M2205/7509 (EP,KR,US);
|
Former IPC [2000/03] | A61M1/36, // C07K14/18, C07K16/08 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2000/03] | Title | German: | ADSORPTIONSMITTEL ZUM ELIMINEREN DES HEPATITIS-C-VIRUS,ADSORBER UND ADSORPTIONSVERFAHREN | [2000/03] | English: | ADSORBENT FOR ELIMINATING HEPATITIS C VIRUS, ADSORBER, AND ADSORPTION METHOD | [2000/03] | French: | ADSORBANT DESTINE A ELIMINER LE VIRUS DE L'HEPATITE C, ADSORBEUR ET METHODE D'ADSORPTION | [2000/03] | Entry into regional phase | 20.10.1999 | Translation filed | 19.10.1999 | National basic fee paid | 19.10.1999 | Search fee paid | 19.10.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.10.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.08.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 20.10.1999 | Examination requested [2000/03] | 14.07.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.11.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.07.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03) | 31.10.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/21] | 08.01.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2008/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 05.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4576928 (TANI NOBUTAKA [JP], et al) [X] 1-6,8,9,11,12,14-16 * column 2, line 1 - line 7 * * column 2, line 14 - line 20 * * column 7, line 49 - line 55 * * column 5, line 12 - line 13 * * column 12, line 59 * * column 13, line 47 - column 14, line 2; example 34 *; | [X]WO9009237 (BIOPROCESSING LTD [GB]) [X] 1-5,8,9,11,14 * claims 1-3 *; | [X]US5037649 (BALINT JR JOSEPH P [US], et al) [X] 1-6,8,10,11,14 * column 3, line 47 - line 55 * * column 4, line 20 - line 23 * * column 4, line 61 - line 67 *; | [X]EP0752425 (TECNOGEN SCPA [IT]) [X] 1-3,7* page 3, line 37 - line 56 * | International search | [A]EP0447984 (ABBOTT LAB [US]); | [A]JPH0640926 (CHEMO SERO THERAPEUT RES INST); | [P]RU2095815 (PADYUKOV LEONID N [SU], et al); | [A] - SAELBERG M., ET AL., "PASSIVE ADSORPTION OF IMMUNOLOGICALLY ACTIVE AND INACTIVE SYNTHETICPEPTIDES TO POLYSTYRENE IS INFLUENCED BY THE PROPORTION OF NON- POLAR RESIDUES IN THE PEPTIDE.", IMMUNOLOGY LETTERS., Elsevier BV, NL, NL, (19950101), vol. 46., no. 01/02., doi:10.1016/0165-2478(95)00010-3, ISSN 0165-2478, pages 25 - 30., XP002914398 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0165-2478(95)00010-3 |