Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0970987

EP0970987 - FLUORORESIN FILMS, LAMINATE PRODUCED BY USING THE SAME, AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCING LAMINATE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  27.08.2004
Database last updated on 17.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip27.08.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 13.10.2004  [2004/42]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ASAHI GLASS COMPANY LTD.
12-1, Yurakucho 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8405 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/13]For all designated states
ASAHI GLASS COMPANY LTD.
12-1, Yurakucho 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8405 / JP
Former [2000/02]For all designated states
Asahi Glass Company Ltd.
1-2, Marunouchi 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-0005 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / OKI, Satoshi, Asahi Glass Co. Ltd Chuo Kenkyusho
1150, Hazawa-cho, Kanagawa-ku
Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 221-0863 / JP
02 / HAYASHI, Atsushi, Asahi Glass Co.Ltd Chuo Kenkyusho
1150, Hazawa-cho, Kanagawa-ku
Yokohama-shi, Kawagawa 221-0863 / JP
03 / FUKAWA, Makoto, Asahi Glass Co.Ltd Chuo Kenkyusho
1150, Hazawa-cho, Kanagawa-ku
Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 221-0863 / JP
04 / ARUGA, Hiroshi, Asahi Glass Co.Ltd, Tamagawa Bunshi
474-2,Tsukagoshi 3-chome, Saiwai-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 210-0924 / JP
05 / HAYASHI, Yasuo, Asahi Glass Co.Ltd Chuo Kenkyushush
1150, Hazawa-cho, Kanagawa-ku
Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 221-0863 / JP
06 / YONEMORI, Shigeaki, Asahi Glass Co.Ltd
1, Aza-Asahi, Taketoyo-cho
Chita-gun, Aichi 470-2300 / JP
07 / JITSUGIRI, Yukio, Asahi Glass Co.Ltd Chuo Kenkyusho
1150, Hazawa-cho, Kanagawa-ku
Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 221-0863 / JP
[2000/02]
Representative(s)Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Friedenheimer Brücke 21
80639 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/02]Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte
Grafinger Strasse 2
81671 München / DE
Application number, filing date98911059.827.03.1998
[2000/02]
WO1998JP01397
Priority number, dateJP1997009500628.03.1997         Original published format: JP 9500697
[2000/02]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9844026
Date:08.10.1998
Language:EN
[1998/40]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0970987
Date:12.01.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.10.1998
[2000/02]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0970987
Date:22.10.2003
Language:EN
[2003/43]
Search report(s)International search reportJP08.10.1998
(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP14.04.2000
ClassificationInternational:C08J7/00, C08J5/18, B32B27/30, B29C59/14
[2000/02]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [2000/02]
TitleGerman:FLUORHARZFOLIE,VERBUNDMATERIAL DAS DIESE VERWENDET UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON VERBUNDMATERIALIEN[2000/02]
English:FLUORORESIN FILMS, LAMINATE PRODUCED BY USING THE SAME, AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCING LAMINATE[2000/02]
French:FILMS DE RESINE FLUOREE, STRATIFIES OBTENUS A PARTIR DUDIT MATERIAU, ET PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION DESDITS STRATIFIES[2000/02]
Entry into regional phase14.10.1999Translation filed 
14.10.1999National basic fee paid 
14.10.1999Search fee paid 
14.10.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
14.10.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure01.10.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP
14.10.1999Examination requested  [2000/02]
15.05.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.09.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.11.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
26.02.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.04.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.08.2003Fee for grant paid
14.08.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)23.07.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/42]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
27.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
27.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
27.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0644227  (UNIV TOKAI [JP], et al) [X] 1,3-5 * page 3, line 24 - line 27 * * page 3, line 55 - page 4, line 2 * * page 5, line 2 - line 11 * * page 6, line 13 - line 15 * * page 8, line 15 - line 22 *;
 [A]EP0467639  (EC CHEM IND CO [JP], et al) [A] 1,3-5 * example 24 *;
 [A]US4548867  (UENO SUSUMU [JP], et al) [A] 1,3-5 * column 3, line 13 - line 14 * * column 4, line 31 - line 50 *;
 [A]US4933060  (PROHASKA GEORGE W [US], et al) [A] 1,3-5 * column 2, line 59 - line 60 * * column 3, line 9 - line 64 *;
 JPS50103584  [ ] (TORAY INDUSTIES);
 [X]EP0479592  (BRIDGESTONE CORP [JP], et al) [X] 7,8,10 * page 3, line 50 - page 4, line 10 * * page 5, line 20 - line 36; example 1; claim 1; table 1 *;
 [X]JPS59171649  ;
 [A]WO9708229  (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD [JP], et al) [A] 9 * claim 9 *;
 EP0848031  [ ] (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD [JP])
 [A]  - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19760126), vol. 84, no. 4, Database accession no. 18660, XP002133207 [A] 2 * abstract *
 [X]  - 1, vol. 1984, no. 45, Database accession no. 1984-278999, XP002133208 [X] 7,8,10 * abstract *
International search[Y]JPS51125455
 [Y]JPH06298971
 [Y]JPS60181135
 [Y]JPH02229032
 [Y]JPS5577566