Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0997172

EP0997172 - GAME SYSTEM, GAME DEVICE, AND GAME METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  21.06.2002
Database last updated on 18.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip21.06.2002Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 07.08.2002  [2002/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SNK CORPORATION
1-6, Enoki-cho, Suita-shi
Osaka 564-0053 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/18]For all designated states
SNK CORPORATION
1-6, Enoki-cho
Suita-shi, Osaka 564-0053 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / NISHIYAMA, Takashi
1-11-23-601, Terauti
Toyonaka-shi Osaka 560-0872 / JP
02 / MATSUMOTO, Yoshinori
3-4-15-207, Tagawa
Yodogawa-ku Osaka 532-0027 / JP
[2000/18]
Representative(s)Urner, Peter , et al
Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner
Patentanwälte mbB
Mauerkircherstrasse 45
81679 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/18]Urner, Peter, Dipl.-Phys. , et al
TER MEER STEINMEISTER & PARTNER GbR, Patentanwälte, Mauerkircherstrasse 45
81679 München / DE
Application number, filing date98911217.206.04.1998
[2000/18]
WO1998JP01579
Priority number, dateJP1997012465307.04.1997         Original published format: JP 12465397
JP1997030639820.10.1997         Original published format: JP 30639897
[2000/18]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9845005
Date:15.10.1998
Language:EN
[1998/41]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0997172
Date:03.05.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.10.1998
[2000/18]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP15.10.1998
ClassificationInternational:A63F9/22, G09B9/00, G06M7/00, G03B15/00, G06T1/00
[2000/18]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2000/18]
TitleGerman:SPIELSYSTEM, SPIELVORRICHTUNG UND SPIELVERFAHREN[2000/18]
English:GAME SYSTEM, GAME DEVICE, AND GAME METHOD[2000/18]
French:SYSTEME, DISPOSITIF ET PROCEDE DE JEU[2000/18]
Entry into regional phase15.10.1998Translation filed 
04.11.1999National basic fee paid 
04.11.1999Search fee paid 
04.11.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
04.11.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure30.09.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP
04.11.1999Examination requested  [2000/18]
31.10.2001Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2002/32]
02.01.2002Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2002/32]
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.11.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.04.200104   M06   Not yet paid
30.04.200205   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[X]JPH08131654  (SHARP KK);
 [X]JPH08309032  (CASIO COMPUTER CO LTD);
 [Y]JPH0847579  (CASIO COMPUTER CO LTD);
 [A]JP3014733U  ;
 [XE]JPH0348489U  ;
 [A]JPH06165881  (CASIO COMPUTER CO LTD);
 [A]JPH08106539  (SANYO ELECTRIC CO);
 [A]JPS63242293  (NAMUKO KK)