Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0974652

EP0974652 - CANCEROUS METASTASIS-ASSOCIATED GENE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  29.04.2005
Database last updated on 18.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip25.07.2008Change - representativepublished on 27.08.2008  [2008/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BANYU PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD.
2-3, Nihombashi Honcho 2-chome Chuo-ku
Tokyo 103-8416 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/04]For all designated states
BANYU PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD.
2-3, Nihonbashi Honcho 2-chome
Chuo-ku, Tokyo 103-8416 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / MORITA, Masashi Banyu Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd.
Tsukuba Research Institute 3, Okubo
Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki 300-2611 / JP
02 / ARAKAWA, Hiroharu Banyu Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd.
Tsukuba Research Institute 3, Okubo
Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki 300-2611 / JP
03 / OHTA, Masataka Banyu Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd.
Tsukuba Research Institute 3, Okubo
Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki 300-2611 / JP
[2000/28]
Former [2000/04]01 / MORITA, Masashi Banyu Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd.
Tsukuba Research Institute 3, Okubo Tsukuba-shi
Ibaraki 300-2611 / JP
02 / ARAKAWA, Hiroharu Banyu Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd.
Tsukuba Research Institute 3, Okubo, Tsukuba-shi
Ibaraki 300-2611 / JP
03 / OHTA, Masataka Banyu Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd.
Tsukuba Research Institute 3, Okubo Tsukuba-shi
Ibaraki 300-2611 / JP
Representative(s)Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/35]Vossius & Partner
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
Former [2000/04]VOSSIUS & PARTNER
Siebertstrasse 4
81675 München / DE
Application number, filing date98911227.107.04.1998
[2000/04]
WO1998JP01592
Priority number, dateJP1997010533308.04.1997         Original published format: JP 10533397
[2000/04]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9845431
Date:15.10.1998
Language:EN
[1998/41]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0974652
Date:26.01.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.10.1998
[2000/04]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP15.10.1998
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.07.2000
ClassificationInternational:C12N15/12, C12P21/02, C12N5/10, C07K14/47, C07K16/18, G01N33/53, G01N33/574
[2000/04]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/04]
TitleGerman:MIT KREBSMETASTASEN ASSOZIIERTE GENE[2000/04]
English:CANCEROUS METASTASIS-ASSOCIATED GENE[2000/04]
French:GENE ASSOCIE A LA METASTASE CANCEREUSE[2000/04]
Biological materialThis application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details
Entry into regional phase08.11.1999Translation filed 
08.11.1999National basic fee paid 
08.11.1999Search fee paid 
08.11.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
08.11.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure06.11.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP
08.11.1999Examination requested  [2000/04]
02.06.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
14.12.2004Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2005/24]
14.01.2005Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2005/24]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.04.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
30.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
30.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
30.04.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
30.04.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[X]  - ZITNIK RJ ET AL, "The cloning and characterisation of a murine secretory leukocyte protease inhibitor cDNA", BIOCHEM BIOPHYS RES COMMUN, (19970327), vol. 232, no. 3, pages 687 - 689, XP000910263 [X] 1-3,5-9 * page 690 - page 691; figure 1B *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/bbrc.1997.6358
 [X]  - MARRA M ET AL, "M. musculus cDNA clone", DATABASE EMBL, (19961025), XP002140375 [X] 5 * the whole document *
 [PX]  - ABE T ET AL, "Bacterial pneumonia causes augmented expression of the secretory leukoprotease inhibitor gene in the murine lung", AM J RESPIR CRIT CARE MED, (199710), vol. 156, pages 1235 - 1240, XP000915892 [PX] 1-3,5-9 * the whole document *
International search[X]  - JIN F.-Y., ET AL., "SECRETORY LEUKOCYTE PROTEASE INHIBITOR: A MACROPHAGE PRODUCT INDUCED BY AND ANTAGONISTIC TO BACTERIAL LIPOPOLYSACCHARIDE", CELL, CELL PRESS, US, US, (19970207), vol. 88., doi:10.1016/S0092-8674(00)81880-2, ISSN 0092-8674, pages 417 - 426., XP002911480

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0092-8674(00)81880-2
 [XP]  - MORLTA M., ET AL., "ISOLATION OF TWO METASTASIS-RELATED CANDIDATE GENES FROM A LIVER METASTATIC MURINE CARCINOMA, IMC-HM.", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 88TH. ANNUAL MEETING OF THE AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR CANCER RESEARCH. SAN DIEGO, APR. 12 - 16, 1997., PHILADELPHIA, AACR., US, US, (19970101), VOL.38, page 546., XP002911481
 [A]  - ARAKAWA H., ET AL., "ANTIMETASTATIC EFFECT OF A NOVEL INDOLOCARBAZOLE (NB-506) ON IMC-HMMURINE TUMOR CELLS METASTASIZED TO THE LIVER.", JAPANESE JOURNAL OF CANCER RESEARCH, AMSTERDAM, NL, NL, (19960501), vol. 87., pages 518 - 523., XP002911482
 [Y]  - STEIN C. A., CHENG Y.-C., "ANTISENSE OLIGONUCLEOTIDES AS THERAPEUTIC AGENTS- IS THE BULLET REALLY MAGICAL?", Science, American Association for the Advancement of Science, (19930820), vol. 261., doi:10.1126/science.8351515, ISSN 0036-8075, pages 1004 - 1012., XP002911483

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.8351515