Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0968046

EP0968046 - PROCESS FOR THE REMOVAL OF CONTAMINANTS FROM A GAS, USING A GAS CLEANING AGENT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  28.06.2002
Database last updated on 18.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip05.09.2008Change - representativepublished on 08.10.2008  [2008/41]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Gemeente Amsterdam, Gemeentelijke Dienst Afvalverwerking
Australiehavenweg 21
1045 BA Amsterdam / NL
[N/P]
Former [2000/01]For all designated states
Gemeente Amsterdam, Gemeentelijke Dienst Afvalverwerking
Australiehavenweg 21
1045 BA Amsterdam / NL
Inventor(s)01 / DE VRIES, Cornelis
Potvisstraat 39
NL-1035 HJ Amsterdam / NL
[2000/01]
Representative(s)Kupecz, Arpad
Octrooibureau Los en Stigter B.V.
P.O. Box 20052
1000 HB Amsterdam / NL
[N/P]
Former [2008/41]Kupecz, Arpad
Octrooibureau Los en Stigter B.V. P.O. Box 20052
1000 HB Amsterdam / NL
Former [2000/01]Kupecz, Arpad
Octrooibureau Los en Stigter B.V. P.O. Box 20052
1000 HB Amsterdam / NL
Application number, filing date98911265.117.03.1998
[2000/01]
WO1998NL00153
Priority number, dateNL1997100557820.03.1997         Original published format: NL 1005578
[2000/01]
Filing languageNL
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9841310
Date:24.09.1998
Language:EN
[1998/38]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0968046
Date:05.01.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.09.1998
[2000/01]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0968046
Date:22.08.2001
Language:EN
[2001/34]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP24.09.1998
ClassificationInternational:B01D53/70, B01D53/72
[2000/01]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/01]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR ENTFERNUNG VON VERUNREINIGUNGEN AUS EINEM GAS MIT EINEM REINIGUNGNNGSMITTEL[2000/01]
English:PROCESS FOR THE REMOVAL OF CONTAMINANTS FROM A GAS, USING A GAS CLEANING AGENT[2000/01]
French:PROCEDE D'ENLEVEMENT DE CONTAMINANTS A PARTIR D'UN GAZ, AU MOYEN D'UN AGENT DE NETTOYAGE DE GAZ[2000/01]
Entry into regional phase15.09.1998Translation filed 
13.09.1999National basic fee paid 
13.09.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
13.09.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure22.09.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
13.09.1999Examination requested  [2000/01]
24.11.2000Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
05.01.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.03.2001Fee for grant paid
23.03.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)23.05.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2002/33]
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
22.02.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[DX]EP0442079  (ARASIN GMBH [DE]) [DX] 1-7 * page 5, line 11 - line 15; claim - *;
 [AD]DE3939214  (FTU GMBH [DE]) [AD] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE4244513  (H D N TECHNIK GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * the whole document *