Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0968613

EP0968613 - TRANSMISSION OF MPEG-ENCODED DATA IN ATM-SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  21.08.2009
Database last updated on 15.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip11.06.2010Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): GB
published on 14.07.2010  [2010/28]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
TELIASONERA AB
Marbackagatan 11
123 86 Farsta / SE
[2008/42]
Former [2007/47]For all designated states
TeliaSonera AB
Marbackagatan 11
123 86 Farsta / SE
Former [2000/01]For all designated states
Telia AB (publ)
Marbackagatan 11
123 86 Farsta / SE
Inventor(s)01 / THOLIN, Per
Vapengatan 12
S-126 52 Hägersten / SE
02 / BAHLENBERG, Gunnar
Blidvägen 234
S-976 32 Lule / SE
03 / DILLNER, Erik
Rämensv. 14
S-120 55 Arsta / SE
04 / JOHANSSON, Magnus
Timmermansgatan 34
S-972 41 Lule / SE
05 / LJUNGGREN, Lis-Marie
Praktikantvägen 31
S-977 53 Lule / SE
06 / TONVALL, Harry
Vuopiogatan 8
S-984 31 Pajala / SE
07 / WESTER, Per-Ola
Dalgränd 6
S-121 30 Enskede / SE
[2000/01]
Representative(s)Aurell, Henrik , et al
Zacco Sweden AB
P.O. Box 4289
203 14 Malmö / SE
[N/P]
Former [2009/32]Aurell, Henrik , et al
Albihns AB P.O. Box 4289
203 14 Malmö / SE
Former [2000/01]Akerman, Marten Lennart
Albihns Patentbyra Malmö AB P.O.Box 4289
203 14 Malmö 4 / SE
Application number, filing date98911323.816.03.1998
[2000/01]
WO1998SE00479
Priority number, dateSE1997000098118.03.1997         Original published format: SE 9700981
[2000/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9842140
Date:24.09.1998
Language:EN
[1998/38]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0968613
Date:05.01.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.09.1998
[2000/01]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0968613
Date:15.10.2008
Language:EN
[2008/42]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:SE24.09.1998
ClassificationInternational:H04N7/62, H04L12/56, H04Q11/04
[2000/01]
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   DK,   FI,   FR,   GB,   LI,   NL,   SE [2000/01]
Extension statesLT18.10.1999
LV18.10.1999
TitleGerman:ÜBERTRAGUNG VON MPEG-KODIERTEN DATEN IN ATM-SYSTEMEN[2000/01]
English:TRANSMISSION OF MPEG-ENCODED DATA IN ATM-SYSTEMS[2000/01]
French:TRANSMISSION DE DONNEES CODEES MPEG, DANS DES SYSTEMES MTA[2000/01]
Entry into regional phase18.10.1999National basic fee paid 
18.10.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
18.10.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure30.09.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE
18.10.1999Examination requested  [2000/01]
21.11.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
01.06.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.05.2008Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 03.06.2008
08.05.2008Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
26.05.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.06.2008Date of oral proceedings
03.06.2008Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
28.08.2008Fee for grant paid
28.08.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)16.07.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2009/39]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
02.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
02.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
31.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
31.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
31.03.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
31.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 09
02.04.2007Renewal fee patent year 10
31.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 11
Lapses during opposition  TooltipDK15.10.2008
FI15.10.2008
NL15.10.2008
SE15.01.2009
GB16.03.2009
CH31.03.2009
LI31.03.2009
[2010/28]
Former [2010/19]DK15.10.2008
FI15.10.2008
NL15.10.2008
SE15.01.2009
CH31.03.2009
LI31.03.2009
Former [2010/05]DK15.10.2008
FI15.10.2008
NL15.10.2008
SE15.01.2009
Former [2009/30]FI15.10.2008
NL15.10.2008
Cited inInternational search[X]US5563884  (FIMOFF MARK [US], et al);
 [X]EP0720410  (ITALTEL SPA [IT]);
 [X]EP0738083  (DIGITAL EQUIPMENT CORP [US]);
 [A]US5565928  (SAEGER TIMOTHY W [US], et al);
 [A]EP0577329  (AMERICAN TELEPHONE & TELEGRAPH [US]);
 [A]EP0735776  (HITACHI LTD [JP]);
 [A]US5594492  (O'CALLAGHAN DANIEL [US], et al)