Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1048179

EP1048179 - COMMUNICATIONS LOCALIZATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  13.05.2005
Database last updated on 25.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip14.10.2016Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 16.11.2016  [2016/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
KSI INC.
Suite 219, 7630 Little River Turnpike
Annandale, VA 22203 / US
[2000/44]
Inventor(s)01 / MALONEY, John, E.
5753 Heming Avenue
Springfield, VA 22151 / US
02 / STEVENSON, James, O.
4408 Manor Hall Lane
Fairfax, VA 22033 / US
[2000/44]
Representative(s)Hoarton, Lloyd Douglas Charles
Forresters IP LLP
Skygarden
Erika-Mann-Strasse 11
80636 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/44]Hoarton, Lloyd Douglas Charles
Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22
80336 Munich / DE
Former [2000/44]Hoarton, Lloyd Douglas Charles
Forrester & Boehmert, Franz-Joseph-Strasse 38
80801 München / DE
Application number, filing date98911360.016.01.1998
[2000/44]
WO1998US00973
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO9832297
Date:23.07.1998
Language:EN
[1998/29]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1048179
Date:02.11.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.07.1998
[2000/44]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1048179
Date:07.07.2004
Language:EN
[2004/28]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP12.11.1998
ClassificationInternational:H04Q7/00
[2000/44]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/44]
Extension statesAL07.08.2000
LT07.08.2000
LV07.08.2000
MK07.08.2000
RO07.08.2000
SI07.08.2000
TitleGerman:KOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM MIT POSITIONSBESTIMMUNG[2000/44]
English:COMMUNICATIONS LOCALIZATION SYSTEM[2000/44]
French:SYSTEME DE LOCALISATION DE COMMUNICATIONS[2000/44]
Entry into regional phase07.08.2000National basic fee paid 
07.08.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
07.08.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure29.07.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
07.08.2000Examination requested  [2000/44]
13.05.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
06.11.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.12.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.05.2004Fee for grant paid
10.05.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)08.04.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/26]
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.08.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
18.12.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
14.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
14.01.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
14.01.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT07.07.2004
BE07.07.2004
CH07.07.2004
LI07.07.2004
DK07.10.2004
GR07.10.2004
PT07.12.2004
LU16.01.2005
MC31.01.2005
[2016/46]
Former [2008/15]AT07.07.2004
BE07.07.2004
CH07.07.2004
LI07.07.2004
DK07.10.2004
GR07.10.2004
PT07.12.2004
LU16.01.2005
MC31.01.2005
Former [2007/17]AT07.07.2004
BE07.07.2004
CH07.07.2004
LI07.07.2004
DK07.10.2004
GR07.10.2004
LU16.01.2005
MC31.01.2005
Former [2006/14]AT07.07.2004
BE07.07.2004
CH07.07.2004
LI07.07.2004
DK07.10.2004
GR07.10.2004
MC31.01.2005
Former [2005/28]AT07.07.2004
BE07.07.2004
CH07.07.2004
LI07.07.2004
DK07.10.2004
GR07.10.2004
DE08.10.2004
Former [2005/22]AT07.07.2004
CH07.07.2004
LI07.07.2004
DK07.10.2004
GR07.10.2004
DE08.10.2004
Former [2005/21]AT07.07.2004
CH07.07.2004
LI07.07.2004
GR07.10.2004
DE08.10.2004
Former [2005/18]AT07.07.2004
GR07.10.2004
DE08.10.2004
Former [2005/14]AT07.07.2004
DE08.10.2004
Former [2005/13]AT07.07.2004
Cited inInternational search[A]WO9602006  (LOCKHEED SANDERS INC [US], et al) [A] 1,2 * figures 1-3 * * page 7, line 8 - line 12 *;
 [A]WO8801061  (VENTANA SCIENCES INC [US]) [A] 1,4 * abstract *;
 [D]US4728959  (MALONEY JOHN E [US], et al)