Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0978013

EP0978013 - PRINTABLE ELECTRONIC DISPLAY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  23.12.1999
Database last updated on 22.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip11.07.2008Change - representativepublished on 13.08.2008  [2008/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MASSACHUSETTS INSTITUTE OF TECHNOLOGY
77 Massachusetts Avenue
Cambridge, MA 02139 / US
[2000/06]
Inventor(s)01 / TURNER, Christopher
25 Gorham Street
Somerville, MA 02144 / US
02 / JACOBSON, Joseph M.
Apartment 1, 31 Linnaean Street
Cambridge, MA 02139 / US
03 / COMISKEY, Barrett
346 Putnam Avenue
Cambridge, MA 01239 / US
[2000/15]
Former [2000/06]01 / TURNER, Christopher
25 Gorham Street
Somerville, MA 02144 / US
02 / JACOBSON, Joseph M.
Apartment 1, 31 Linnaean Street
Cambridge, MA 02139 / US
03 / COMISKEY, Barrett
50 Massachusetts Avenue
Cambridge, MA 02139 / US
Representative(s)Hackett, Sean James , et al
Marks & Clerk LLP
Alpha Tower
Suffolk Street Queensway
Birmingham B1 1TT / GB
[N/P]
Former [2008/33]Hackett, Sean James , et al
Marks & Clerk Alpha Tower Suffolk Street Queensway
Birmingham B1 1TT / GB
Former [2000/06]Hackett, Sean James , et al
Marks & Clerk, Patent Attorneys, Alpha Tower, Suffolk Street Queensway
Birmingham B1 1TT / GB
Application number, filing date98911592.806.03.1998
[2000/06]
WO1998US04842
Priority number, dateUS1997082005718.03.1997         Original published format: US 820057
[2000/06]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO9841898
Date:24.09.1998
Language:EN
[1998/38]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0978013
Date:09.02.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.09.1998
[2000/06]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP26.11.1998
ClassificationInternational:G02F1/167, G09F9/37, H02J17/00, G02F1/13
[2000/06]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2000/06]
TitleGerman:DRUCKBARE ELEKTRONISCHE ANZEIGE[2000/06]
English:PRINTABLE ELECTRONIC DISPLAY[2000/06]
French:DISPOSITIF D'AFFICHAGE ELECTRONIQUE IMPRIMABLE[2000/06]
Entry into regional phase21.09.1999National basic fee paid 
21.09.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
21.09.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure15.10.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
19.12.1998Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [1999/40]
08.04.1999Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time  [1999/40]
21.09.1999Examination requested  [2000/06]
24.04.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
04.11.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.12.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
11.06.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.11.2003Application refused, date of legal effect [2005/21]
14.11.2003Date of oral proceedings
06.02.2004Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2004/28]
06.02.2004Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2005/21]
06.02.2004Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
16.02.2004Application refused, date of legal effect [2004/28]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.02.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
21.02.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
22.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
24.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
22.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
Cited inInternational search[XY]WO9704398  (JACOBSON JOSEPH M [US]) [X] 1-7,10-13,24-28,33-38 * the whole document * [Y] 8,9,14-23,29-32,39;
 [Y]US4298448  (MUELLER KLAUS, et al) [Y] 8,9,39 * the whole document *;
 [Y]EP0361420  (UBE INDUSTRIES [JP]) [Y] 14-23,32 * column 9, line 27 - column 10, line 52 * * column 12, line 56 - column 13, line 34 * * column 20, line 26 - line 53 *;
 [Y]US5250932  (YOSHIMOTO HATAAKI [JP], et al) [Y] 14-23,32 * the whole document *;
 [Y]EP0684579  (IBM [US]) [Y] 29 * column 8, line 1 - line 48 *;
 [Y]EP0404545  (JAPAN SYNTHETIC RUBBER CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 30 * column 6, line 18 - column 8, line 3 * * column 10, line 30 - column 11, line 14 * * column 14, line 56 - column 15, line 27 *;
 [Y]US4947219  (BOEHM MARCUS [US]) [Y] 19-23,31 * the whole document *;
 [X]US5548282  (ESCRITT CHRIS [GB], et al) [X] 40-44 * column 9, line 32 - line 44 *;
 [X]GB2149548  (PHILP ROBERT) [X] 40,41,43,44 * the whole document *;
 [X]DE19500694  (HAUCK MARTIN [DE]) [X] 40,42-44 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE4431441  (LICENTIA GMBH [DE]) [A] 40-44;
 [Y]US4450440  (WHITE ROGER P [US]) [Y] 45 * the whole document *;
 [Y]US4149149  (MIKI MASAYUKI, et al) [Y] 45 * column 2, line 30 - column 4, line 17; figures 1,2 *;
 [Y]US4301407  (KOSLAR MANFRED) [Y] 45 * the whole document *
Examination US5070326
  US5066105
  US5128785
  US5250932
  GB1314906
  US4062626
  US4490014
  US3781862
    - Chiang, A.; Fairbairn, D.G.: 'A high speed electrophoretic matrix display' SID International Symposium, Digest of Technical Papers, San Diego, USA, 29 April-1 May 1980, pages 114-115
    - HOWARD W.E.: 'Active-matrix techniques for displays' PROCEEDINGS OF THE SID vol. 27, no. 4, 1986, PLAYA DEL REY, CA, US, pages 313 - 326, XP000005335