Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0984797

EP0984797 - BONE PASTE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  04.01.2003
Database last updated on 17.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip04.01.2003Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 19.02.2003  [2003/08]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
University of Florida Tissue Bank, Inc.
1 Innovation Drive
Alachua, FL 32615 / US
For all designated states
University of Florida Research Foundation, Inc.
223 Grinter Hall
Gainesville, FL 32611 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/11]For all designated states
University of Florida Tissue Bank, Inc.
1 Innovation Drive
Alachua, FL 32615 / US
For all designated states
UNIVERSITY OF FLORIDA RESEARCH FOUNDATION, INC.
223 Grinter Hall
Gainesville, FL 32611 / US
Inventor(s)01 / WIRONEN, John, F.
Unit 101,707 S.W. 75th Street
Gainesville, FL 32607 / US
02 / GROOMS, Jamie, M.
5131 N.W. 76th Lane
Gainesville, FL 32653 / US
[2000/11]
Representative(s)Perry, Robert Edward
Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower
20 Primrose Street
London
EC2A 2ES / GB
[N/P]
Former [2002/42]Perry, Robert Edward
GILL JENNINGS & EVERY Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street
London EC2M 7LH / GB
Former [2002/39]Samuels, Lucy Alice
Gill Jennings & Every Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street
London EC2M 7LH / GB
Former [2000/11]Perry, Robert Edward
GILL JENNINGS & EVERY Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street
London EC2M 7LH / GB
Application number, filing date98911607.412.03.1998
[2000/11]
WO1998US04904
Priority number, dateUS1997081607913.03.1997         Original published format: US 816079
[2000/11]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9840113
Date:17.09.1998
Language:EN
[1998/37]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0984797
Date:15.03.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.09.1998
[2000/11]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP17.09.1998
ClassificationInternational:A61L27/00
[2000/11]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/11]
TitleGerman:KNOCHENPASTE[2000/11]
English:BONE PASTE[2000/11]
French:PATE POUR OS[2000/11]
Entry into regional phase20.09.1999National basic fee paid 
20.09.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
20.09.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure05.10.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
20.09.1999Examination requested  [2000/11]
06.02.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
17.06.2002Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2003/08]
20.09.2002Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2003/08]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
27.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
27.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[X]WO9639203  (BIOCOLL LAB INC [US]) [X] 1-37 * page 20, line 5 - line 20; claim - *;
 [X]EP0530804  (SHAW ROBERT F [US]) [X] 1-37 * example .; claim - *;
 [X]EP0329239  (FORESTI GIANCARLO) [X] 1,2,6,12 * claim - *;
 [X]DE4216496  (SATTEL WERNER PROF DR MED [DE], et al) [X] 1,2,6,12 * claim - *;
 [X]JPS6432371  ;
 [X]WO9213565  (SHAW ROBERT F [US]) [X] 1,2 * example -; claim - *;
 [X]EP0147021  (GEISTLICH SOEHNE AG [CH]) [X] 1 * page 4, line 11 - line 12; claim - *;
 [A]JPS63181770  ;
 [A]JPH01288269  ;
 [A]JPH05123390  ;
 [A]JPH05277174
 [X]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 89, no. 11, Database accession no. 89-080728, XP002073037 & JPS6432371 A 00000000 (NITTA GELATIN KK) [X] 1,2 * abstract *
 [A]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 88, no. 35, Database accession no. 88-247568, XP002073038 & JPS63181770 A 00000000 (NAGASE M) [A] 1 * abstract *
 [A]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 90, no. 01, Database accession no. 90-004589, XP002073039 & JPH01288269 A 00000000 (TOA NENRYO KOGYO KK) [A] 1 * abstract *
 [A]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 93, no. 25, Database accession no. 93-199779, XP002073040 & JPH05123390 A 00000000 (KYOCERA CORP) [A] 1 * abstract *
 [A]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 93, no. 47, Database accession no. 93-373633, XP002073041 & JPH05277174 A 00000000 (KYOCERA CORP) [A] 1 * abstract *