blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0973499

EP0973499 - DIFFUSIONAL IMPLANTABLE DELIVERY SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  11.06.2004
Database last updated on 18.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip11.06.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 28.07.2004  [2004/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ALZA Corporation
950 Page Mill Road P.O. Box 10950 Palo Alto
California 94303-0802 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/04]For all designated states
ALZA CORPORATION
950 Page Mill Road P.O. Box 10950
Palo Alto California 94303-0802 / US
Inventor(s)01 / ROORDA, Wouter, E.
7596 Birkdale Drive
Newark, CA 94560 / US
02 / DIONNE, Keith, E.
4 Hancock Park
Cambridge, MA 01239 / US
03 / BROWN, James, E.
126 Blueberry Hill Drive
Los Gatos, CA 95032 / US
04 / WRIGHT, Jeremy, C.
631 Cuesta Drive
Los Altos, CA 94024 / US
05 / DAVIS, Craig, R.
5237 Orkney Court
Newark, CA 94560 / US
06 / PRESTRELSKI, Steven, J.
1971 West Middlefield Road 5
Mountain View, CA 94043 / US
07 / TZANNIS, Stelios, T.
1901 Rock Street
Mountain View, CA 94043 / US
[2000/04]
Representative(s)Brown, Fraser Gregory James, et al
Cleveland
10 Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1BR / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/04]Brown, Fraser Gregory James, et al
fJ Cleveland 40-43 Chancery Lane
London WC2A 1JQ / GB
Application number, filing date98911690.017.03.1998
[2000/04]
WO1998US05138
Priority number, dateUS19970042196P31.03.1997         Original published format: US 42196 P
[2000/04]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9843611
Date:08.10.1998
Language:EN
[1998/40]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0973499
Date:26.01.2000
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.10.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2000/04]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0973499
Date:06.08.2003
Language:EN
[2003/32]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP08.10.1998
ClassificationIPC:A61K9/00
[2000/04]
CPC:
A61K9/0024 (EP,US); A61K9/00 (KR); A61K31/445 (EP,US);
A61K31/675 (EP,US); A61K47/26 (EP,US); A61K9/0004 (EP,US);
A61P31/18 (EP); A61F2250/0067 (EP,US); A61K9/145 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/04]
TitleGerman:IMPLANTIERBARES DIFFUSIONABGABESYSTEM[2000/04]
English:DIFFUSIONAL IMPLANTABLE DELIVERY SYSTEM[2000/04]
French:SYSTEME D'ADMINISTRATION PAR DIFFUSION, IMPLANTABLE[2000/04]
Entry into regional phase18.10.1999National basic fee paid 
18.10.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
18.10.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.10.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
19.10.1999Examination requested  [2000/04]
22.08.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
07.01.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.02.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.05.2003Fee for grant paid
21.05.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP03075231.5  / EP1304105
Opposition(s)07.05.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/31]
Fees paidRenewal fee
06.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
08.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
22.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
11.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[A]US3760984  (THEEUWES F) [A] 1-28* the whole document *;
 [A]US3845770  (THEEUWES F, et al) [A] 1-28 * the whole document *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.