Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0971872

EP0971872 - PROCESS FOR PREPARING 2,6-NAPHTHALENEDICARBOXYLIC ACID [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  15.04.2003
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip15.04.2003No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 28.05.2003  [2003/22]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BP Corporation North America Inc.
200 East Randolph Drive MC 2207A
Chicago, IL 60601 / US
[N/P]
Former [2001/32]For all designated states
BP Corporation North America Inc.
200 East Randolph Drive MC 2207A
Chicago, IL 60601 / US
Former [2000/03]For all designated states
BP Amoco Corporation
Mail Code 1907A, P.O. Box 87703, 200 East Randolph Drive
Chicago, IL 60680-0703 / US
Inventor(s)01 / MCMAHON, Rosemary, F.
2351 Albright Lane
Wheaton, IL 60187 / US
02 / GREENE, James, D., Jr.
3413 Tanglewood Drive, S.W.
Decatur, AL 35603 / US
03 / PETERSON, David, A.
1021 Williamsburg
Westmont, IL 60559 / US
[2000/03]
Representative(s)Ritter, Stephen David , et al
Mathys & Squire LLP 120 Holborn London
EC1N 2SQ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/03]Ritter, Stephen David , et al
Mathys & Squire 100 Grays Inn Road
London WC1X 8AL / GB
Application number, filing date98911730.417.03.1998
[2000/03]
WO1998US05212
Priority number, dateUS1997082703925.03.1997         Original published format: US 827039
[2000/03]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9842649
Date:01.10.1998
Language:EN
[1998/39]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0971872
Date:19.01.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.10.1998
[2000/03]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0971872
Date:05.06.2002
Language:EN
[2002/23]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP01.10.1998
ClassificationInternational:C07C51/265, C07C63/38
[2000/03]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL [2000/03]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR VORBEREITUNG VON 2,6-NAPHTHALINDICARBONSAÜRE[2000/03]
English:PROCESS FOR PREPARING 2,6-NAPHTHALENEDICARBOXYLIC ACID[2000/03]
French:PROCEDE DE PREPARATION D'ACIDE 2,6-NAPHTALENEDICARBOXYLIQUE[2000/03]
Entry into regional phase20.09.1999National basic fee paid 
20.09.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
20.09.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure13.10.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
20.09.1999Examination requested  [2000/03]
26.07.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
14.11.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
01.02.2002Fee for grant paid
01.02.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)06.03.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/22]
Fees paidRenewal fee
06.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
05.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
04.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[DX]US5183933  (HARPER JON J ET AL) [DX] 1,2 * column 2, line 59 - column 3, line 17 * * column 5, line 1 - line 44 * * column 8, line 4 - line 27 * * column 10, line 24 - line 39 * * column 7, line 42 - line 49 * * claims 1,2,16,21 *;
 [X]US4933491  (ALBERTINS RUSINS ET AL) [X] 1,2,4 * column 3, line 29 - line 48 * * column 3, line 63 - column 4, line 19 * * column 4, line 45 - column 5, line 20 * * examples 1,7 *;
 [A]EP0600375  (MITSUBISHI PETROCHEMICAL CO) [A] 1,5 * column 2, line 10 - line 43 * * column 3, line 3 - line 20 * * column 3, line 48 - column 4, line 9 * * example 3 *;
 [A]EP0361840  (AMOCO CORP) [A] 1,5 * page 2, line 7 - line 9 * * page 3, line 47 - page 4, line 6 * * page 4, line 41 - line 55 * * page 5, line 42 *