EP0991485 - METAL FIBER SHEET AND METHOD OF MAKING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.02.2005 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.02.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.04.2005 [2005/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fibermark, Inc. 110 Tredegar Street Richmond, VA 23219 / US | [2000/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KINSLEY, Homan, B., Jr. 3257 Three Bridge Road Powhatan, VA 23139 / US | [2000/15] | Representative(s) | Daniels, Jeffrey Nicholas, et al Page White & Farrer Limited Bedford House 21A John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/15] | Daniels, Jeffrey Nicholas, et al Page White & Farrer 54 Doughty Street London WC1N 2LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 98911819.5 | 23.03.1998 | [2000/15] | WO1998US05393 | Priority number, date | US19970829313 | 31.03.1997 Original published format: US 829313 | [2000/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9843756 | Date: | 08.10.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0991485 | Date: | 12.04.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.10.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 08.10.1998 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.06.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B21C37/00, B32B15/00, B32B9/00, B32B27/00, B32B23/04, D21H11/00 | [2000/15] | CPC: |
H01M4/806 (EP,US);
B01D39/2041 (EP,US);
B22F3/002 (EP,US);
B22F3/22 (EP,US);
B22F5/006 (EP,US);
D21H13/48 (EP,US);
H01M4/80 (EP,US);
D21H17/26 (EP,US);
D21H17/28 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/15] | Title | German: | METALLFASERBAHN UND VERFAHREN ZUR IHRER HERSTELLUNG | [2000/15] | English: | METAL FIBER SHEET AND METHOD OF MAKING SAME | [2000/15] | French: | TOLE DE FIBRES METALLIQUES ET SON PROCEDE DE FABRICATION | [2000/15] | Entry into regional phase | 28.10.1999 | National basic fee paid | 28.10.1999 | Search fee paid | 28.10.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.10.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.10.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 28.10.1999 | Examination requested [2000/15] | 01.10.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/14] | 05.11.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2005/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2004 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPS61289200 ; | [A]JPS59116498 ; | [A]JPH06277422 ; | [A]US2962415 (ARLEDTER HANNS F); | [A]US3127668 (TROY WALTER C) [A] 1-19 * claims 1,5 *; | [Y]US3952130 (NASON STEPHEN G) [Y] 1,10,14,15 * abstract *; | [XY]US4279696 (PIERSOL JAY L) [X] 1,14 * example . * [Y] 2-5,7,8,11-13,18,19; | [A]US4373992 (BONDOC ALFREDO A); | [Y]GB2118925 (DEARBORN CHEMICAL LIMITED) [Y] 6 * the whole document *; | [Y]US4748075 (BEYER HORST [DE], et al) [Y] 1,10,14,15 * abstract * * claim 1 *; | [A]US5244721 (WYCHE CHRISTINE C [US], et al) [A] 1-19 * the whole document *; | [XDY] - ARLEDTER H. F., "METAL FIBERS.", SYNTHETIC FIBERS IN PAPERMAKING, XX, XX, XX, (19640101), pages 118 - 121 + 144/145, XP002911068 [XD] 1,2,7,9-12,14-17 * page 118, paragraph 1 * * page 120, paragraph 2 * * table 6.7 * * page 156, paragraph 2 * * page 157, line 17 - line 30 * * page 161, line 17 - line 26 * * page 180, line 10 - line 27 * [Y] 3-6,8,13,18,19 | [Y] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1987, no. 05, Database accession no. 1987-033008, XP002169223 & JPS61289200 A 19861219 (AISIN SEIKI KK) [Y] 1,2,4,5,7,10-12,14 * abstract * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1984, no. 33, Database accession no. 1984-204092, XP002169224 & JPS59116498 A 19840705 (KOHJIN CO LTD) [A] 7,11 * abstract * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1994, no. 44, Database accession no. 1994-353850, XP002169225 & JPH06277422 A 19941004 (FILTRATION KK) [A] 1,10,14-16,18,19 * abstract * | International search | [X]US2971877 (ARLEDTER HANNS F); | [X]US4265703 (TERLISKA JACQUES); | [YP]US5685897 (BELDING WILLIAM A [US], et al) |