Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0970474

EP0970474 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR SYNCHRONIZING DEVICES IN AN AUDIO/VIDEO SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  11.01.2002
Database last updated on 27.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip11.01.2002Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 27.02.2002  [2002/09]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
AVID TECHNOLOGY, INC.
Metropolitan Technology Park, One Park West
Tewksbury, MA 01876 / US
[2000/02]
Inventor(s)01 / LAMACCHIA, Sam, R.
229 Pacific Avenue
Redwood City, CA 94063 / US
[2000/02]
Representative(s)Kazi, Ilya , et al
Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard
32 London Bridge Street
London SE1 9SG / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/02]Kazi, Ilya , et al
Mathys & Squire, 100 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8AL / GB
Application number, filing date98911825.219.03.1998
[2000/02]
WO1998US05404
Priority number, dateUS1997082133620.03.1997         Original published format: US 821336
[2000/02]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9841988
Date:24.09.1998
Language:EN
[1998/38]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0970474
Date:12.01.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.09.1998
[2000/02]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP24.09.1998
ClassificationInternational:G11B27/10, G11B27/034
[2000/02]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2000/02]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND GERÄT ZUR SYNCHRONISIERUNG VON ANORDNUNGEN IN EINEM AUDIO-/VIDEOSYSTEM[2000/02]
English:METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR SYNCHRONIZING DEVICES IN AN AUDIO/VIDEO SYSTEM[2000/02]
French:PROCEDE ET APPAREIL DE SYNCHRONISATION DE DISPOSITIFS DANS UN SYSTEME AUDIO/VIDEO[2000/02]
Entry into regional phase19.10.1999National basic fee paid 
19.10.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
19.10.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure16.10.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
19.10.1999Examination requested  [2000/02]
05.12.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08)
17.08.2001Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2002/09]
20.09.2001Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2002/09]
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.10.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
08.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[A]US5506932  (HOLMES DANIEL J ET AL) [A] 1-6,11,16,17,21,26 * column W *;
 [A]WO9427209  (TALIGENT INC) [A] 1,11,16,21,26 * the whole document *;
 [A]US5557423  (PHILLIPS MICHAEL ET AL) [A] 1-3,11,12,16-18,21,22,26 * column W *;
 [A]GB2235815  (COMPACT VIDEO GROUP INC) [A] 1-3,11,16,21,26 * page 19, line 13 - page 25, line 23; figures 5-7 *;
 [A]WO9321588  (AVID TECHNOLOGY INC ;FASCIANO PETER J (US); RAWLEY CURT A (US); HE) [A] 1-3,11,16,21,26 * the whole document *;
 [A]GB2195810  (SONY CORP) [A] 1,2,11,16,21,26 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE4128327  (BEHRENS JOACHIM ;DAHLMANN UWE (DE)) [A] 1,11,16,21,26 * column 5, line 17 - column 7, line 3; figures 3-6 *;
 [DPA]WO9739529  (AVID TECHNOLOGY INC) [DPA] 1,11,16,21,26 * the whole document *