Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1007006

EP1007006 - CEFADROXIL MONOHYDRATE TABLET FORMULATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  30.04.2004
Database last updated on 19.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip05.09.2008Change - representativepublished on 08.10.2008  [2008/41]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Bristol-Myers Squibb Company
Route 206 and Province Line Road
Princeton, NJ 08543 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/24]For all designated states
Bristol-Myers Squibb Company
5 Research Parkway
Wallingford, CT 06492-7660 / US
Inventor(s)01 / REMON, Jean, Paul, Louis, Auguste
Rijsenbergstraat 51
B-9000 Gent / BE
[2000/24]
Representative(s)Carpmaels & Ransford LLP
One Southampton Row
London WC1B 5HA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2008/41]Carpmaels & Ransford
One Southampton Row London
WC1B 5HA / GB
Former [2003/17]Carpmaels & Ransford
43 Bloomsbury Square
London WC1A 2RA / GB
Former [2000/24]Jones, Alan John , et al
CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square
London, WC1A 2RA / GB
Application number, filing date98911832.819.03.1998
[2000/24]
WO1998US05412
Priority number, dateUS19970044140P17.04.1997         Original published format: US 44140 P
[2000/29]
Former [2000/24]US1997004414017.04.1997
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9846213
Date:22.10.1998
Language:EN
[1998/42]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1007006
Date:14.06.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.10.1998
[2000/24]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1007006
Date:25.06.2003
Language:EN
[2003/26]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US22.10.1998
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.06.2001
ClassificationInternational:A61K9/20, A61K31/545, A61K9/00
[2001/33]
Former International [2000/24]A61K9/20, A61K31/545
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/24]
TitleGerman:CEFADROXILMONOHYDRAT TABLETTENFORMULIERUNG[2000/24]
English:CEFADROXIL MONOHYDRATE TABLET FORMULATION[2000/24]
French:FORMULATION DE COMPRIMES DE MONOHYDRATE DE CEFADROXIL[2000/24]
Entry into regional phase04.11.1999National basic fee paid 
04.11.1999Search fee paid 
04.11.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
04.11.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.11.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
04.11.1999Examination requested  [2000/24]
03.01.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.04.2003Fee for grant paid
09.04.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)26.03.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/25]
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.11.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
16.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
13.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
11.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search   [ ] No further relevant documents disclosed
International search[Y]US4504657  (BOUZARD DANIEL [FR], et al);
 [Y]WO9624337  (YAMANOUCHI EUROP BV [NL], et al)