Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0969716

EP0969716 - ENDOMETRIOSIS MOUSE MODEL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  07.07.2006
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip07.07.2006Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 09.08.2006  [2006/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Reprogen, Inc.
Suite 210, 163 West Technology Drive
Irvine, CA 92618 / US
For all designated states
UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA
Suite 300, 3700 Market Street
Philadelphia, PA 19104-3147 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/02]For all designated states
Reprogen, Inc.
Suite 210, 163 West Technology Drive
Irvine, CA 92618 / US
For all designated states
THE UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA
Suite 300, 3700 Market Street
Philadelphia, PA 19104-3147 / US
Inventor(s)01 / BOYD, Jeffrey
303 E. 60th Street 38-J
New York, NY 10022 / US
02 / STRAUSS, Jerome, J.
805 Gravers Lane
Wyndmoor, PA 19038 / US
03 / VAN DEERLIN, Peter
24 Rosedale Road
Wynnewood, PA 19096 / US
04 / YAMAMOTO, Karen, K.
524 W. Avenida de los Lobos Marinos
San Clemente, CA 92672 / US
[2000/02]
Representative(s)Bizley, Richard Edward , et al
Avidity IP
Broers Building
Hauser Forum
21 J J Thomson Ave
Cambridge CB3 0FA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/02]Bizley, Richard Edward , et al
Hepworth, Lawrence, Bryer & Bizley Merlin House Falconry Court Baker's Lane
Epping Essex CM16 5DQ / GB
Application number, filing date98912035.725.03.1998
[2000/02]
WO1998US05874
Priority number, dateUS19970042542P26.03.1997         Original published format: US 42542 P
[2000/02]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9842185
Date:01.10.1998
Language:EN
[1998/39]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0969716
Date:12.01.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.10.1998
[2000/02]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP01.10.1998
ClassificationInternational:A01K67/027
[2000/02]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/02]
TitleGerman:MAUSMODELL FÜR ENDOMETRIOSE[2000/02]
English:ENDOMETRIOSIS MOUSE MODEL[2000/02]
French:SOURIS UTILISEES COMME MODELE POUR L'ETUDE DE L'ENDOMETRIOSE[2000/02]
Entry into regional phase22.10.1999National basic fee paid 
22.10.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
22.10.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure15.10.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
28.10.1999Examination requested  [2000/02]
04.10.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.02.2006Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2006/32]
23.03.2006Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2006/32]
Fees paidRenewal fee
03.04.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
08.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
22.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
24.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
22.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
22.03.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
01.04.200003   M06   Fee paid on   03.04.2000
31.03.200609   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[DA]  - BERGQVIST, A. ET AL., "Human uterine endometrium and endometriotic tissue transplanted into nude mice", AMERICAN JOURNAL OF PATHOLOGY, (198511), vol. 121, no. 2, pages 337 - 341, XP002069299 [DA] 1-5,7-9,11,12 * the whole document *
 [DA]  - ZAMAH, N.M. ET AL., "Transplantation of normal and ectopic human endometrial tissue into athymic nude mice", AMERICAN JOURNAL OF OBSTETRICS AND GYNECOLOGY, (19840715), vol. 149, no. 6, pages 591 - 597, XP002069300 [DA] 1-5,7-9,11,12 * the whole document *
 [A]  - KAUFMANN, R. ET AL., "STABLE ENGRAFTMENT OF HUMAN FEMALE GENITAL MUCOUS MEMBRANE XENOGRAFTS ON SCID MICE", GYNECOLOGIC AND OBSTETRIC INVESTIGATION, (1995), vol. 40, no. 2, pages 97 - 100, XP002069301 [A] 1,5,7,8,11 * the whole document *
 [AD]  - AOKI, D. ET AL., "Successful heterotransplantation of human endometrium in SCID mice", OBSTETRICS AND GYNECOLOGY, (199402), vol. 83, no. 2, pages 220 - 228, XP002069302 [AD] 1-5,7,11,12 * the whole document *
 [AD]  - BERGQVIST, A. ET AL., "Human endometrium transplanted into Nude mice : histologic effects of various steroid hormones", AMERICAN JOURNAL OF PATHOLOGY, (198505), vol. 119, no. 2, pages 336 - 344, XP002069303 [AD] 1,2,5,11 * the whole document *