Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0970527

EP0970527 - DECALS AND METHODS FOR PROVIDING AN ANTIREFLECTIVE COATING AND METALLIZATION ON A SOLAR CELL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  26.11.1999
Database last updated on 24.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip26.09.2008Change - representativepublished on 29.10.2008  [2008/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Evergreen Solar, Inc.
211 Second Avenue
Waltham, MA 02154 / US
[2000/02]
Inventor(s)01 / HANOKA, Jack, I.
107 York Terrace
Brookline, MA 02146 / US
02 / LORD, Brynley, E.
33 Cleveland Street
Arlington, MA 02174 / US
03 / MROWKA, Mark, T.
241 Cross Road
Lunenburg, MA 01462 / US
04 / MA, Xinfa
5 Minute Man Lane
Lexington, MA 02173 / US
[2000/02]
Representative(s)Greenwood, John David , et al
Graham Watt & Co LLP
St Botolph's House
7-9 St Botolph's Road
Sevenoaks
Kent TN13 3AJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2008/44]Greenwood, John David , et al
Graham Watt & Co LLP St Botolph's House 7-9 St Botolph's Road Sevenoaks
Kent TN13 3AJ / GB
Former [2004/31]Greenwood, John David , et al
Graham Watt & Co LLP St Botolph's House 7-9 St Botolph's Road
Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 3AJ / GB
Former [2000/02]Harvey, David Gareth , et al
Graham Watt & Co. Riverhead
Sevenoaks Kent TN13 2BN / GB
Application number, filing date98912050.624.03.1998
[2000/02]
WO1998US05928
Priority number, dateUS1997082385725.03.1997         Original published format: US 823857
[2000/02]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO9843282
Date:01.10.1998
Language:EN
[1998/39]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0970527
Date:12.01.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.10.1998
[2000/02]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP25.02.1999
ClassificationInternational:H01L31/048
[2000/02]
Designated contracting statesBE,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   IE,   IT,   LI,   NL [2000/02]
TitleGerman:ABZIEHBILDER UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN VON EINER VERGÜTETEN SCHICHT UND VON EINER METALLISIERUNG AUF EINER SOLARZELLE[2000/02]
English:DECALS AND METHODS FOR PROVIDING AN ANTIREFLECTIVE COATING AND METALLIZATION ON A SOLAR CELL[2000/02]
French:DECALQUES ET PROCEDE VISANT A CONSTITUER UN ENDUIT ANTIREFLECHISSANT ET UNE METALLISATION SUR UNE CELLULE SOLAIRE[2000/02]
Entry into regional phase21.09.1999National basic fee paid 
21.09.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
21.09.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.10.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
21.09.1999Examination requested  [2000/02]
20.12.2006Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time
Fees paidRenewal fee
06.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
08.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
22.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
24.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
20.08.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
04.03.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.200407   M06   Fee paid on   20.08.2004
31.03.200609   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[A]US5055907  (JACOBS SCOTT L);
 [XA]US4131488  (LESK ISRAEL A ET AL) [X] 33 * the whole document * [A] 27,32
 [A]  - ANONYMOUS, "Decal interconnection bonding method", IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN., NEW YORK US, (196712), vol. 10, no. 7, pages 1074 - 1075, XP002088435 [A] 1,9,10,27 * the whole document *
 [A]  - ANONYMOUS, "Interconnection decal employing silicon adhesive", IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN., NEW YORK US, (196804), vol. 10, no. 11, pages 1667 - 1668, XP002088436 [A] 1,9,10,27,32 * the whole document *
 [A]  - ANONYMOUS, "Silicon-on-silicon- The integral decal", IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN., NEW YORK US, (199006), vol. 33, no. 1A, pages 174 - 177, XP002088437 [A] 1,9,10,14,27 * the whole document *