Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1038052

EP1038052 - REMOTE CATHODIC PROTECTION MONITORING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  17.05.2002
Database last updated on 15.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip07.03.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CH, IT, LI
published on 09.04.2008  [2008/15]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Gas Technology Institute
3424 South State Street
Chicago, Illinois 60616 / US
[2001/24]
Former [2000/39]For all designated states
INSTITUTE OF GAS TECHNOLOGY
1700 South Mount Prospect Road
Des Plaines, IL 60018 / US
Inventor(s)01 / COOPER, Joel
307 Independence Avenue
West Islip, NY 11795 / US
02 / GERSHMAN, Albert, W.
236 Matawan Avenue
Matawan, NJ 07747 / US
03 / McCARTY, Joe, W.
7237 W. 21st Avenue
Gary, IN 46406 / US
04 / SHAPIRO, Arthur
38 Alexine Avenue
East Rockaway, NY 11518 / US
05 / ZIOLKOWSKI, Christopher, J.
649 Sunnyside Avenue
Elmhurst, IL 60126 / US
[2000/39]
Representative(s)Schneider Feldmann AG Patent- und Markenanwälte
Beethovenstrasse 49
Postfach
8027 Zürich / CH
[N/P]
Former [2000/39]Patentanwaltsbüro Feldmann AG
Kanalstrasse 17
8152 Glattbrugg / CH
Application number, filing date98912133.031.03.1998
[2000/39]
WO1998US06320
Priority number, dateUS1997096796312.11.1997         Original published format: US 967963
[2000/39]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9924641
Date:20.05.1999
Language:EN
[1999/20]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1038052
Date:27.09.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.05.1999
[2000/39]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1038052
Date:11.07.2001
Language:EN
[2001/28]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP20.05.1999
ClassificationInternational:C23F13/22
[2000/39]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/39]
TitleGerman:KATHODENSCHUTZFERNÜBERWACHUNGSSYSTEM[2000/39]
English:REMOTE CATHODIC PROTECTION MONITORING SYSTEM[2000/39]
French:SYSTEME DE SURVEILLANCE DE PROTECTION CATHODIQUE A DISTANCE[2000/39]
Entry into regional phase23.05.2000National basic fee paid 
23.05.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
23.05.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure10.06.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
23.05.2000Examination requested  [2000/39]
14.11.2000Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
19.01.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.03.2001Fee for grant paid
23.03.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)12.04.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2002/27]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.07.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
08.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
01.04.200003   M06   Fee paid on   21.07.2000
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT11.07.2001
BE11.07.2001
CH11.07.2001
FI11.07.2001
IT11.07.2001
LI11.07.2001
NL11.07.2001
DK11.10.2001
PT11.10.2001
SE11.10.2001
DE12.10.2001
GR12.10.2001
ES31.01.2002
GB31.03.2002
LU31.03.2002
MC31.03.2002
IE01.04.2002
[2008/15]
Former [2004/51]AT11.07.2001
BE11.07.2001
FI11.07.2001
NL11.07.2001
DK11.10.2001
PT11.10.2001
SE11.10.2001
DE12.10.2001
GR12.10.2001
ES31.01.2002
GB31.03.2002
LU31.03.2002
MC31.03.2002
IE01.04.2002
Former [2004/39]AT11.07.2001
BE11.07.2001
FI11.07.2001
NL11.07.2001
DK11.10.2001
PT11.10.2001
SE11.10.2001
DE12.10.2001
ES31.01.2002
GB31.03.2002
LU31.03.2002
MC31.03.2002
IE01.04.2002
Former [2004/04]AT11.07.2001
BE11.07.2001
FI11.07.2001
NL11.07.2001
DK11.10.2001
PT11.10.2001
SE11.10.2001
DE12.10.2001
ES31.01.2002
GB31.03.2002
MC31.03.2002
IE01.04.2002
Former [2003/46]AT11.07.2001
BE11.07.2001
FI11.07.2001
NL11.07.2001
DK11.10.2001
PT11.10.2001
SE11.10.2001
DE12.10.2001
GB31.03.2002
MC31.03.2002
IE01.04.2002
Former [2003/29]AT11.07.2001
BE11.07.2001
FI11.07.2001
NL11.07.2001
PT11.10.2001
SE11.10.2001
DE12.10.2001
GB31.03.2002
MC31.03.2002
IE01.04.2002
Former [2003/25]AT11.07.2001
BE11.07.2001
FI11.07.2001
NL11.07.2001
PT11.10.2001
SE11.10.2001
DE12.10.2001
GB31.03.2002
MC31.03.2002
Former [2003/17]AT11.07.2001
BE11.07.2001
FI11.07.2001
NL11.07.2001
PT11.10.2001
SE11.10.2001
DE12.10.2001
GB31.03.2002
Former [2003/09]AT11.07.2001
BE11.07.2001
FI11.07.2001
NL11.07.2001
PT11.10.2001
SE11.10.2001
DE12.10.2001
Former [2002/29]AT11.07.2001
BE11.07.2001
FI11.07.2001
PT11.10.2001
SE11.10.2001
DE12.10.2001
Former [2002/27]AT11.07.2001
FI11.07.2001
PT11.10.2001
SE11.10.2001
DE12.10.2001
Former [2002/15]AT11.07.2001
FI11.07.2001
SE11.10.2001
DE12.10.2001
Former [2002/05]SE11.10.2001
Cited inInternational search[X]GB1557153  (WILSON WALTON INT LTD) [X] 1,9,10 * the whole document *