blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0973615

EP0973615 - METHOD FOR CLEANING WASTE PROCESS GASES CONTAINING DUST [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  06.06.2003
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip06.06.2003No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 23.07.2003  [2003/30]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
VOEST-ALPINE Industrieanlagenbau GmbH
Turmstrasse 44
4020 Linz / AT
[N/P]
Former [2000/04]For all designated states
VOEST-ALPINE INDUSTRIEANLAGENBAU GMBH
Turmstrasse 44
4020 Linz / AT
Inventor(s)01 / LANZERSTORFER, Christof
Grieskirchnerstrasse 76
A-4600 Wels / AT
[2000/04]
Representative(s)VA TECH Patente GmbH & Co
Wolfgang-Pauli-Strasse 2
4020 Linz / AT
[N/P]
Former [2001/17]VA TECH Patente GmbH
Stahlstrasse 21 a
4020 Linz / AT
Former [2001/12]VA TECH Patente GmbH
Serravagasse 10
1140 Wien / AT
Former [2000/04]Rieberer, Stefan, Dipl.-Ing.
VA TECH Patente GmbH, Stahlstrasse 21a
4020 Linz / AT
Application number, filing date98912138.903.04.1998
[2000/04]
WO1998AT00088
Priority number, dateAT1997000062111.04.1997         Original published format: AT 62197
[2000/04]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9846359
Date:22.10.1998
Language:DE
[1998/42]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0973615
Date:26.01.2000
Language:DE
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.10.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2000/04]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0973615
Date:31.07.2002
Language:DE
[2002/31]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP22.10.1998
ClassificationIPC:B03C3/16, B03C3/36
[2000/04]
CPC:
B03C3/16 (EP); B03C3/36 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   DE,   GB,   IT [2000/04]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR REINIGUNG VON STAUBBELADENEN PROZESSABGASEN[2000/04]
English:METHOD FOR CLEANING WASTE PROCESS GASES CONTAINING DUST[2000/04]
French:PROCEDE DE PURIFICATION D'EFFLUENTS GAZEUX DE PROCEDE CHARGES DE POUSSIERE[2000/04]
Entry into regional phase20.08.1999National basic fee paid 
20.08.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
20.08.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure23.10.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
20.08.1999Examination requested  [2000/04]
31.01.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
14.02.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.03.2002Fee for grant paid
18.03.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)06.05.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/30]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
23.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
25.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[X]DE3329638  (BISCHOFF GASREINIGUNG [DE]) [X] 1-3,6* page 8, paragraph 1 - page 9, paragraph 2; figures 1-3; claims 1,3,5,6 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.