EP0969740 - IMPROVED PROCESS FOR THE MANUFACTURE OF COLLAGEN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.04.2002 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.04.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.05.2002 [2002/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Clearcoll Pty., Ltd. 8 Munmorah Street Wyee, NSW 2059 / AU | [2000/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VIDAL, Linus 8 Munmorah Street Wyee, NSW 2259 / AU | 02 /
VIDAL, Benedicto de Campos Rua Antonio A. de Almeida, 1347 CEP-13083 Campinas, SP / BR | [2000/02] | Representative(s) | Raynor, John, et al Beck Greener Fulwood House 12 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/02] | Raynor, John, et al W.H. Beck, Greener & Co 7 Stone Buildings Lincoln's Inn London WC2A 3SZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 98912152.0 | 03.04.1998 | [2000/02] | WO1998AU00226 | Priority number, date | AU1997PO05998 | 03.04.1997 Original published format: AU PO599897 | [2000/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9844809 | Date: | 15.10.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0969740 | Date: | 12.01.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.10.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 15.10.1998 | Classification | IPC: | A23L1/0562, A61K35/32, A61K35/36, C08H1/00, C08H1/06, C09H1/00, C09H1/02, C09H1/04 | [2000/02] | CPC: |
A61K38/39 (EP);
C08L89/06 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/02] | Extension states | AL | 03.11.1999 | LT | 03.11.1999 | LV | 03.11.1999 | MK | 03.11.1999 | RO | 03.11.1999 | SI | 03.11.1999 | Title | German: | VERBESSERTES VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON KOLLAGEN | [2000/02] | English: | IMPROVED PROCESS FOR THE MANUFACTURE OF COLLAGEN | [2000/02] | French: | PROCEDE AMELIORE POUR FABRIQUER DU COLLAGENE | [2000/02] | Entry into regional phase | 03.11.1999 | National basic fee paid | 03.11.1999 | Search fee paid | 03.11.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.11.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.10.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU | 03.11.1999 | Examination requested [2000/02] | 01.11.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/22] | 12.12.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2002/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.05.2000 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   15.05.2000 | 30.04.2001 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JP08100153 ; | [A]EP0284789 ; | [A]JP60028936 ; | [A]DD156112 ; | [A]AU6215890 (ORGANOGENESIS INC); | [A]AU8028191 (BAUSCH & LOMB); | [A]US5138030 (PACHENCE JAMES M [US]); | [AP]US5720955 (WEINER HOWARD L [US], et al) | [A] - JAPIO ONLINE ABSTRACT, Accession No. 96-100153, Class C09H; & JP,A,08 100 153 (KAWABATA MAKOTO et al.) 16 April 1996., & JP08100153 A 19960416 | [A] - DERWENT WPAT ONLINE ABSTRACT, Accession No. 88-279646/40, Class B04, D22; & EP,A,284 789 (GENTILI IST SPA) 5 October 1988., & EP0284789 A 00000000 | [A] - JAPIO ONLINE ABSTRACT, Accession No. 85-028936, Class A61K; & JP,A,60 028 936 (KOKEN: KK) 14-02-85., & JP60028936 A 00000000 | [A] - DERWENT WPAT ONLINE ABSTRACT, Accession No. 82-00062J/47, Class A11, D13, G03; & DD,A,156 112 (GIDINARSKEHO VU PR) 4 August 1982., & DD156112 A 00000000 |