Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0966364

EP0966364 - CONVERTIBLE REAR SEAT ASSEMBLY FOR A VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [1999/52]CONVERTIBLE REAR SEAT ASSEMBLY FOR A VEHICLE
[2000/37]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  05.04.2002
Database last updated on 22.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip05.04.2002No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 22.05.2002  [2002/21]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Magna Interior Systems Inc.
337 Magna Drive Aurora
Ontario L4G 7K1 / CA
[N/P]
Former [1999/52]For all designated states
Magna Interior Systems Inc.
337 Magna Drive
Aurora, Ontario L4G 7K1 / CA
Inventor(s)01 / NEALE, Colin, G.
39473 Village Run Drive
Northville, MI 48167 / US
[2000/51]
Former [1999/52]01 / NEALE, Colin, G.
20242 Old Colony
Dearborn Heights, MI 48127 / US
Representative(s)Hössle Patentanwälte Partnerschaft
Postfach 10 23 38
70019 Stuttgart / DE
[N/P]
Former [2001/40]Hössle & Kudlek
Patentanwälte, Postfach 10 23 38
70019 Stuttgart / DE
Former [2000/37]Kovac, Werner
c/o Magna Europa AG, Patentabteilung, 2. Haidequerstrasse 3
1111 Wien / AT
Former [1999/52]Kovac, Werner
c/o Steyr-Daimler-Puch AG Patent- und Lizenzwesen Franz-Josefs-Kai 51
1010 Wien / AT
Application number, filing date98912161.116.03.1998
[1999/52]
WO1998CA00215
Priority number, dateUS19970040573P14.03.1997         Original published format: US 40573 P
US19970067041P04.12.1997         Original published format: US 67041 P
[1999/52]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9841419
Date:24.09.1998
Language:EN
[1998/38]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0966364
Date:29.12.1999
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.09.1998
[1999/52]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0966364
Date:30.05.2001
Language:EN
[2001/22]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP24.09.1998
ClassificationInternational:B60N2/36
[1999/52]
Designated contracting statesAT,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   PT [1999/52]
TitleGerman:VERÄNDERBARE RÜCKSITZANORDNUNG FÜR KRAFTFAHRZEUGE[2001/22]
English:CONVERTIBLE REAR SEAT ASSEMBLY FOR A VEHICLE[2001/22]
French:ENSEMBLE SIEGE ARRIERE CONVERTIBLE POUR AUTOMOBILE[2001/22]
Former [1999/52]VERÄNDERBARE RÜCKSITZANORDNUNG FÜR KRAFTFAHRZEUGE
Former [1999/52]CONVERTIBLE REAR SEAT ASSEMBLY FOR A VEHICLE
Former [1999/52]ENSEMBLE SIEGE ARRIERE CONVERTIBLE POUR AUTOMOBILE
Entry into regional phase18.09.1999National basic fee paid 
18.09.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
18.09.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure07.10.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
18.09.1999Examination requested  [1999/52]
09.05.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
08.07.2000Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.09.2000Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
14.11.2000Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.01.2001Fee for grant paid
17.01.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)01.03.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2002/21]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.02.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
27.02.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[Y]US1894103  (HUNTER KUENZEL S H) [Y] 1-11,23,29 * page 1, line 51 - line 78; figures 3-5; claim 1 *;
 [Y]FR2668990  (GRUAU CONSTRUCTEUR SA [FR]) [Y] 1-7,9,11,23,29 * page 3, line 1 - page 4, line 11; figure - *;
 [Y]DE3312118  (OPEL ADAM AG) [Y] 8,10 * column 2, line 5 - line 20; figure 1 *;
 [DA]US2582687  (FISHER LEONARD E) [DA] 1,29 * column 1, line 8 - line 27; figure - *;
 [A]US2136972  (WILLIAM GRAUNKE HARRY) [A] 1,29 * column 1, line 55 - column 2, line 11; figure 1 *;
 [A]FR2663270  (DURISOTTI SA [FR], et al) [A] * abstract *;
 [A]EP0736412  (FIAT AUTO SPA [IT]) [A] * abstract *;
 [PA]DE19628699  (MC MICRO COMPACT CAR AG [CH]) [PA] * abstract *
by applicantUS2582687
 US3523704
 US3697105
 US5000495
 US4929007
 US4936611