Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0968588

EP0968588 - SERVICE LEVEL AGREEMENT MANAGEMENT IN DATA NETWORKS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  28.02.2003
Database last updated on 17.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip28.02.2003Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 16.04.2003  [2003/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
CROSSKEYS SYSTEMS CORPORATION
350 Terry Fox Drive Kanata
Ontario K2K 2W5 / CA
[N/P]
Former [2000/01]For all designated states
CROSSKEYS SYSTEMS CORPORATION
350 Terry Fox Drive
Kanata Ontario K2K 2W5 / CA
Inventor(s)01 / FORGET, Leo
55 Forest Creek
Stittsville, Ontario K2S 1M1 / CA
02 / CHRISTMAS, Mark
13 Riding Way
Kanata, Ontario K2M 1C3 / CA
[2000/01]
Representative(s)(deleted)
...
[2003/11]
Former [2000/01]McLean, Robert Andreas , et al
Dummett Copp, 25 The Square, Martlesham Heath
Ipswich IP5 3SL / GB
Application number, filing date98912167.816.03.1998
[2000/01]
WO1998CA00232
Priority number, dateCA1997220000914.03.1997         Original published format: CA 2200009
CA1997220001114.03.1997         Original published format: CA 2200011
US19970043080P08.04.1997         Original published format: US 43080 P
[2000/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9842102
Date:24.09.1998
Language:EN
[1998/38]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0968588
Date:05.01.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.09.1998
[2000/01]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP24.09.1998
ClassificationInternational:H04L12/24, H04Q11/04
[2000/01]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   SE [2000/01]
TitleGerman:VERWALTUNG VON DIENSTSTUFENÜBEREINKOMMEN IN DATENNETZEN[2000/01]
English:SERVICE LEVEL AGREEMENT MANAGEMENT IN DATA NETWORKS[2000/01]
French:GESTION D'AGREMENT DE NIVEAU DE SERVICE DANS DES RESEAUX DE DONNEES[2000/01]
Entry into regional phase29.09.1999National basic fee paid 
29.09.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
29.09.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.10.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
29.09.1999Examination requested  [2000/01]
02.10.2002Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2003/16]
05.11.2002Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2003/16]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
16.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.200205   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[X]WO9607281  (BRITISH TELECOMM [GB], et al) [X] 1,2,5-7,9,11,12 * page 6, line 7 - line 10 * * page 14, line 18 - page 15, line 4 * * page 30, line 14 - page 35, line 17 *;
 [A]WO9626588  (CALBETRON SYSTEMS INC [US]) [A] 1-14 * page 2, line 18 - page 2, line 28 * * page 4, line 30 - page 5, line 6 * * page 8, line 26 - page 9, line 1 *;
 [A]  - HINCHLIFFE M ET AL, "CUSTOMER NETWORK MANAGEMENT AND ATM NETWORKS", 1996 IEEE NETWORK OPERATIONS AND MANAGEMENT SYMPOSIUM (NOMS), KYOTO, APR. 15 - 19, 1996, INSTITUTE OF ELECTRICAL AND ELECTRONICS ENGINEERS, (19960415), VOL. 1, no. SYMP. 5, pages 155 - 164, XP000641088 [A] 1-14 * page 157, line 1 - line 8 * * page 161, line 26 - page 162, line 18 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/NOMS.1996.539455