Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0969916

EP0969916 - POLYMERIZATION PROCESS USING A DUAL SHEAR MIXING ELEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  15.04.2003
Database last updated on 24.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip15.04.2003No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 28.05.2003  [2003/22]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NOVA CHEMICALS (INTERNATIONAL) S.A.
Route de la Glane 107, P.O. Box 76
1752 Villars-sur-Glane 1 / CH
[N/P]
Former [2000/02]For all designated states
Nova Chemicals (International) S.A.
Route de la Glane 107, P.O. Box 76
1752 Villars-sur-Glane 1 / CH
Inventor(s)01 / BURKE, Annette, Lynn
9120 Edgebrook Drive N.W.
Calgary, Alberta T3A 5M8 / CA
02 / FOY, Edward, Christopher
8432 - 64 Avenue N.W.
Calgary, Alberta T3B 4H3 / CA
03 / IATROU, John
132 Macewan Glen Close N.W.
Calgary, Alberta T3K 2C3 / CA
04 / KARNIK, Umesh
95 Edgebrook Close N.W.
Calgary, Alberta T3A 4W6 / CA
05 / KIEL, Darwin, Edward
128 East 10 Avenue
New Westminster, British Columbia V3L4R6 / CA
06 / ZBORIL, Vaclav, George
36 Edgepark Crescent N.W.
Calgary, Alberta T3A 4C4 / CA
[2000/02]
Representative(s)Harrison, David Christopher
Mewburn Ellis LLP
City Tower
40 Basinghall Street
London EC2V 5DE / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/02]Harrison, David Christopher
MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway
London WC2B 6HP / GB
Application number, filing date98912177.726.03.1998
[2000/02]
WO1998CA00287
Priority number, dateCA1997220122427.03.1997         Original published format: CA 2201224
[2000/02]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9843725
Date:08.10.1998
Language:EN
[1998/40]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0969916
Date:12.01.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.10.1998
[2000/02]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0969916
Date:05.06.2002
Language:EN
[2002/23]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP08.10.1998
ClassificationInternational:B01F7/16, B01F7/24
[2000/02]
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [2002/10]
Former [2000/02]AT,  BE,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  IT,  NL,  SE 
TitleGerman:POLYMERISATIONSVERFAHREN MIT DOPPELSCHERMISCHELEMENT[2000/02]
English:POLYMERIZATION PROCESS USING A DUAL SHEAR MIXING ELEMENT[2000/02]
French:PROCEDE DE POLYMERISATION METTANT EN APPLICATION UN ELEMENT DE MELANGE A DOUBLE CISAILLEMENT[2000/02]
Entry into regional phase07.10.1999National basic fee paid 
07.10.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
07.10.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.10.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
07.10.1999Examination requested  [2000/02]
17.07.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
05.11.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.01.2002Fee for grant paid
28.01.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)06.03.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/22]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
16.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
13.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[X]DE4106320  (BURGERT BURDOSA) [X] 1-3 * abstract *;
 [PA]US5636923  (NEJAT-BINA IRADJ E) [PA] 1-3 * abstract *;
 [DA]US4496698  (ADRIAANS JAN L J ET AL) [DA] 1-14 * abstract *;
 [DA]US4282339  (DONALDSON CHARLES R ET AL) [DA] 1-14 * abstract *;
 [A]US2298317  (GULF OIL CORP.) [A] 2-5 * figure -; claim - *