Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0973985

EP0973985 - LATTICE BEAM FOR THE PRODUCTION OF MOBILE CONSTRUCTIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  27.02.2004
Database last updated on 18.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip22.12.2006Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IE
published on 24.01.2007  [2007/04]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
OCTANORM-VERTRIEBS-GMBH FÜR BAUELEMENTE
Raiffeisenstrasse 39
70794 Filderstadt / DE
[2000/04]
Inventor(s)01 / BRUDER, Hans
Sulzweg 13/3
D-72631 Aichtal / DE
[2000/04]
Representative(s)Patentanwälte Ruff, Wilhelm, Beier, Dauster & Partner mbB
Postfach 10 40 36
70035 Stuttgart / DE
[N/P]
Former [2001/34]Patentanwälte Ruff, Wilhelm, Beier, Dauster & Partner
Postfach 10 40 36
70035 Stuttgart / DE
Former [2000/04]Wilhelm & Dauster Patentanwälte European Patent Attorneys
Hospitalstrasse 8
70174 Stuttgart / DE
Application number, filing date98912422.728.02.1998
[2000/04]
WO1998EP01143
Priority number, dateDE199711499610.04.1997         Original published format: DE 19714996
[2000/04]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9845552
Date:15.10.1998
Language:DE
[1998/41]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0973985
Date:26.01.2000
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.10.1998
[2000/04]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0973985
Date:23.04.2003
Language:DE
[2003/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP15.10.1998
ClassificationInternational:E04H1/12
[2000/04]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/04]
TitleGerman:GITTERTRÄGER ZUR HERSTELLUNG MOBILER BAUTEN[2000/04]
English:LATTICE BEAM FOR THE PRODUCTION OF MOBILE CONSTRUCTIONS[2000/04]
French:POUTRE EN TREILLIS POUR LA FABRICATION DE CONSTRUCTIONS MOBILES[2000/04]
Entry into regional phase01.10.1999National basic fee paid 
01.10.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
01.10.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure20.10.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
01.10.1999Examination requested  [2000/04]
06.02.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.04.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.06.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
16.10.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.11.2002Fee for grant paid
21.11.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP02011009.4  / EP1231340
Opposition(s)26.01.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/16]
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.12.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
01.12.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
29.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
12.02.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFI23.04.2003
FR23.04.2003
IE23.04.2003
DK23.07.2003
GR23.07.2003
PT23.07.2003
[2007/04]
Former [2006/14]FI23.04.2003
FR23.04.2003
DK23.07.2003
GR23.07.2003
PT23.07.2003
Former [2004/23]FI23.04.2003
DK23.07.2003
GR23.07.2003
PT23.07.2003
Former [2004/05]FI23.04.2003
GR23.07.2003
PT23.07.2003
Former [2004/02]GR23.07.2003
PT23.07.2003
Former [2004/01]PT23.07.2003
Cited inInternational search[A]US4730739  (SEMERAU JR ROBERT J [US]) [A] 1,2,8,9 * column 2, line 66 - column 7, line 31; figures 1-13 *;
 [A]DE9010562U  (XYLO BUCHSTABEN RUDOLF PRIEN GMBH) [A] 1,7 * page 5, paragraph L - page 6, paragraph 1; figures 1-3 *;
 [AD]EP0393090  (OCTANORM VERTRIEBS GMBH [DE]) [AD] 9,12 * page 3, line 40 - page 4, line 39; figures 7,8 *;
 [A]DE3907770  (MILDNER)
by applicantEP0393090