Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0967971

EP0967971 - COSMETIC PREPARATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  18.04.2003
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip07.03.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 09.04.2008  [2008/15]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Cognis Deutschland GmbH & Co. KG
Henkelstrasse 67
40589 Düsseldorf / DE
[2002/17]
Former [2000/01]For all designated states
Cognis Deutschland GmbH
Postfach 13 01 64
40551 Düsseldorf / DE
Inventor(s)01 / BOYXEN, Norbert
Rosenstrasse 29
D-47906 Kempen / DE
02 / BEHLER, Ansgar
Siegfriedstrasse 80
D-46240 Bottrop / DE
03 / HENSEN, Hermann
Rathmacherweg 13
D-42781 Haan / DE
04 / SEIPEL, Werner
Hofstrasse 29
D-40723 Hilden / DE
[2000/01]
Representative(s)Wacker, Manfred
Henkel AG & Co. KGaA
VTP Patente
40191 Düsseldorf / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/01]Wacker, Manfred, Dr.
Henkel KGaA, Patente (VTP)
40191 Düsseldorf / DE
Application number, filing date98912465.611.03.1998
[2000/01]
WO1998EP01395
Priority number, dateDE199711141719.03.1997         Original published format: DE 19711417
[2000/01]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9841187
Date:24.09.1998
Language:DE
[1998/38]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0967971
Date:05.01.2000
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.09.1998
[2000/01]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0967971
Date:12.06.2002
Language:DE
[2002/24]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP24.09.1998
ClassificationInternational:A61K7/50
[2000/01]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [2000/01]
TitleGerman:KOSMETISCHE ZUBEREITUNGEN[2000/01]
English:COSMETIC PREPARATIONS[2000/01]
French:PREPARATIONS COSMETIQUES[2000/01]
Entry into regional phase11.09.1999National basic fee paid 
11.09.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
11.09.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure20.08.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
11.09.1999Examination requested  [2000/01]
06.06.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
15.10.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.01.2002Fee for grant paid
10.01.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)13.03.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/23]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
16.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
13.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFR12.06.2002
GB12.06.2002
IT12.06.2002
NL12.06.2002
ES20.12.2002
[2008/15]
Former [2006/14]FR12.06.2002
GB12.06.2002
NL12.06.2002
ES20.12.2002
Former [2004/04]GB12.06.2002
NL12.06.2002
ES20.12.2002
FR24.01.2003
Former [2003/47]GB12.06.2002
NL12.06.2002
FR24.01.2003
Former [2003/17]GB12.06.2002
NL12.06.2002
Former [2003/09]NL12.06.2002
Cited inInternational search[PX]DE19605360  (HENKEL KGAA) [PX] 1-3,5-7,10 * the whole document *;
 [PX]DE19635553  (HENKEL KGAA) [PX] 1,3,6-8,10 * the whole document *;
 [PX]DE19543633  (HENKEL KGAA) [PX] 1,3,6,10 * the whole document *;
 [PX]DE19537836  (HENKEL KGAA) [PX] 1,3,10 * the whole document *