Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP0971978
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP2001518950Global Dossier 16.10.2001A
Priority number Date
DE19713895 03.04.1997
EP9801552 18.03.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP0971978Global Dossier 17.09.2003B1
EP0971978 19.01.2000A1
Priority number Date
DE19713895 03.04.1997
EP9801552 18.03.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AT250100T 15.10.2003T
Priority number Date
DE19713895 03.04.1997
EP9801552 18.03.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
BR9808444 23.05.2000A
Priority number Date
DE19713895 03.04.1997
EP9801552 18.03.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE59809650D 23.10.2003D1
Priority number Date
DE19713895 03.04.1997
DE59809650 18.03.1998
EP9801552 18.03.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
KR100580414B 16.05.2006B1
KR20010005963 15.01.2001A
Priority number Date
DE19713895 03.04.1997
EP9801552 18.03.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US6689827 10.02.2004B1
Priority number Date
DE19713895 03.04.1997
EP9801552 18.03.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO9845365Global Dossier 15.10.1998A1
Priority number Date
DE19713895 03.04.1997
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
CN1140568C 03.03.2004C
CN1259154 05.07.2000A
Priority number Date
DE19713895 03.04.1997
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DE19713895 08.10.1998A1
Priority number Date
DE19713895 03.04.1997
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
ES2207822T 01.06.2004T3
Priority number Date
DE19713895 03.04.1997