Extract from the Register of European Patents

Legal status: EP0971978

Designated contracting states AT 
 BE 
 DE 
 ES 
 FR 
 GB 
 IT 
 NL 
Examination procedure30.04.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Entry into regional phase04.09.1999National basic fee paid 
04.09.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
04.09.1999Examination fee paid 
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
16.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
09.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
25.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
European patent granted17.09.2003
Opposition procedure18.06.2004No opposition filed within time limit published on 08.09.2004 
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:19.01.2000 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A1
Designated State(s):AT BE DE ES FR GB IT NL
 
Event date:19.01.2000 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:19990904
 
Event date:06.11.2002 
Event description:FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED
Effective DATE:20020920
 
Event date:17.09.2003 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:B1
Designated State(s):AT BE DE ES FR GB IT NL
 
Event date:17.09.2003 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB FG4D
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED
Free Format Text:NOT ENGLISH
 
Event date:23.10.2003 
Event description:CORRESPONDS TO:
Ref Document Number:59809650
Country of Ref Document:DE
DATE OF REF DOCUMENT:20031023
Kind Code of Ref Document:P
 
Event date:26.11.2003 
Event description:GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)
Effective DATE:20031104
 
Event date:01.06.2004 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG ES FG2A 2207822 T3
Code Expl.:+DEFINITIVE PROTECTION
 
Event date:16.07.2004 
Event description:FR: TRANSLATION FILED
 
Event date:08.09.2004 
Event description:NO OPPOSITION FILED
Effective DATE:20040618
 
Event date:23.12.2014 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R082 59809650 DE
Code Expl.: CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE
REPRESENTATIVE:PATENTANWAELTE ISENBRUCK BOESL HOERSCHLER LLP, DE
 
Event date:05.02.2015 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R082 59809650 DE
Code Expl.: CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE
REPRESENTATIVE:PATENTANWAELTE ISENBRUCK BOESL HOERSCHLER LLP, DE
Effective DATE:20141223
 
Event date:05.02.2015 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R081 59809650 DE
Code Expl.: CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE
OWNER:STYROLUTION EUROPE GMBH, DE
Free Format Text:FORMER OWNER: BASF SE, 67063 LUDWIGSHAFEN, DE
Effective DATE:20141223
 
Event date:04.03.2015 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB 732E
Code Expl.: AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)
Free Format Text:REGISTERED BETWEEN 20150205 AND 20150211
 
Event date:19.03.2015 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR PLFP
Code Expl.:+FEE PAYMENT
Year of Fee Payment:18
 
Event date:24.03.2015 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG ES PC2A
Code Expl.:+TRANSFER OF PATENT
OWNER:STYROLUTION EUROPE GMBH
Effective DATE:20150317
 
Event date:30.04.2015 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:ES
Payment DATE:20150325
Year of Fee Payment:18
 
Event date:30.04.2015 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:NL
Payment DATE:20150323
Year of Fee Payment:18
 
Event date:30.04.2015 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IT
Payment DATE:20150326
Year of Fee Payment:18
 
Event date:22.05.2015 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR CJ
Code Expl.: CHANGE IN LEGAL FORM
Effective DATE:20150421
 
Event date:22.05.2015 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR CD
Code Expl.: CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME
OWNER:STYROLUTION EUROPE GMBH, DE
Effective DATE:20150421
 
Event date:22.05.2015 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR TP
Code Expl.: TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY
OWNER:STYROLUTION EUROPE GMBH, DE
Effective DATE:20150421
 
Event date:29.05.2015 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:AT
Payment DATE:20150320
Year of Fee Payment:18
 
Event date:29.05.2015 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FR
Payment DATE:20150319
Year of Fee Payment:18
 
Event date:29.05.2015 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GB
Payment DATE:20150324
Year of Fee Payment:18
 
Event date:31.07.2015 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DE
Payment DATE:20150601
Year of Fee Payment:18
 
Event date:31.08.2015 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:BE
Payment DATE:20150318
Year of Fee Payment:18
 
Event date:15.03.2016 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG AT PC 250100 AT T
Code Expl.: CHANGE OF THE OWNER
OWNER:STYROLUTION EUROPE GMBH, DE
Effective DATE:20160125
 
Event date:23.03.2016 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG NL PD
Code Expl.: CHANGE OF OWNERSHIP
OWNER:STYROLUTION EUROPE GMBH; DE
Free Format Text:DETAILS ASSIGNMENT: VERANDERING VAN EIGENAAR(S), VERANDERING VAN DE JURIDISCHE ENTITEIT; FORMER OWNER NAME: STYROLUTION GMBH
Effective DATE:20151029
 
Event date:31.08.2016 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:BE
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20160331
 
Event date:01.10.2016 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R119 59809650 DE
Code Expl.:-APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE
 
Event date:15.11.2016 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG AT MM01 250100 AT T
Code Expl.:-LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES
Effective DATE:20160318
 
Event date:16.11.2016 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG NL MM
Code Expl.:-LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE
Effective DATE:20160401
 
Event date:23.11.2016 
Event description:GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE
Effective DATE:20160318
 
Event date:30.12.2016 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR ST
Code Expl.:-NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE
Effective DATE:20161130
 
Event date:31.01.2017 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DE
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20161001
 
Event date:31.01.2017 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:NL
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20160401
 
Event date:31.01.2017 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GB
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20160318
 
Event date:31.01.2017 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FR
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20160331
 
Event date:28.02.2017 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:AT
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20160318
 
Event date:28.02.2017 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IT
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20160318
 
Event date:28.04.2017 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG ES FD2A
Code Expl.:-ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN
Effective DATE:20170428
 
Event date:31.08.2017 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:ES
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20160319