Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0971978

EP0971978 - TRANSPARENT IMPACT-RESISTANT MODIFIED THERMOPLASTIC MOULDING MATERIALS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  23.07.2004
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip27.06.2008Change - applicantpublished on 30.07.2008  [2008/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BASF Aktiengesellschaft
Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38
67063 Ludwigshafen / DE
[2008/31]
Former [2003/38]For all designated states
BASF AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
67056 Ludwigshafen / DE
Former [2000/03]For all designated states
BASF AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
67056 Ludwigshafen / DE
Inventor(s)01 / SCHADE, Christian
Lisztstrasse 42
D-67061 Ludwigshafen / DE
02 / NEUMANN, Rainer
Im Palmengarten 9
D-67112 Mutterstadt / DE
03 / MESSINGER, Claudia
B 4.4
D-68159 Mannheim / DE
04 / BENKER, Klaus
Fürstenweg 52
D-67435 Neustadt / DE
05 / KURPS, Armin
Am Wasserturm 54
D-67459 Böhl-Iggelheim / DE
[2000/03]
Application number, filing date98912484.718.03.1998
[2000/03]
WO1998EP01552
Priority number, dateDE199711389503.04.1997         Original published format: DE 19713895
[2000/03]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9845365
Date:15.10.1998
Language:DE
[1998/41]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0971978
Date:19.01.2000
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.10.1998
[2000/03]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0971978
Date:17.09.2003
Language:DE
[2003/38]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP15.10.1998
ClassificationInternational:C08K5/13, C08K5/52, C08L33/12, C08L25/12, C08L51/04, C08L53/02
[2000/03]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [2000/03]
TitleGerman:TRANSPARENTE, SCHLAGZÄHMODIFIZIERTE THERMOPLASTISCHE FORMMASSEN[2000/03]
English:TRANSPARENT IMPACT-RESISTANT MODIFIED THERMOPLASTIC MOULDING MATERIALS[2000/03]
French:MATIERES MOULABLES THERMOPLASTIQUES TRANSPARENTES RESISTANT AU CHOC[2000/03]
Entry into regional phase04.09.1999National basic fee paid 
04.09.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
04.09.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure25.08.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
04.09.1999Examination requested  [2000/03]
20.09.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
26.11.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.04.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.04.2003Fee for grant paid
30.04.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)18.06.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/37]
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
16.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
09.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
25.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
Cited inInternational search[XDY]EP0426499  (ROHM AND HAAS COMPANY) [XD] 1-3,5-12 * page 5, line 12 - line 30; examples 1-3; claims 1,2,8-12 * [Y] 4;
 [Y]DE4111282  (BASF) [Y] 4 * claim 1 *;
 [A]DE2229550  (GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY) [A] 6 * claim 10 *;
 [A]US5451624  (ROHM AND HAAS) [A] 1 * column 8, lines 5-10; claims 1,10 *